EP3176772 - DISPLAY APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2020 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.09.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 17113 / KR | [2019/16] |
Former [2017/23] | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-Gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-Do 17113 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANG, Kinyeng c/o Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
CHOI, Jonghyun c/o Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
KIM, Sunkwang c/o Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
SIM, Suyeon c/o Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
YOON, Joosun c/o Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2019/16] |
Former [2017/23] | 01 /
KANG, Kinyeng c/o Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
02 /
CHOI, Jonghyun c/o Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
03 /
KIM, Sunkwang c/o Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
04 /
SIM, Suyeon c/o Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
05 /
YOON, Joosun c/o Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | Mounteney, Simon James Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/23] | Mounteney, Simon James Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 16185776.8 | 25.08.2016 | [2017/23] | Priority number, date | KR20150170668 | 02.12.2015 Original published format: KR 20150170668 | [2017/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3176772 | Date: | 07.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3176772 | Date: | 17.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/3225, G09G3/3233, H01L51/52, H01L27/32 | [2018/37] | CPC: |
G09G3/3233 (EP,US);
G09G3/20 (CN);
G09G3/3225 (US);
H10K50/8426 (US);
H10K50/844 (US);
H10K59/121 (EP,US);
H10K59/131 (EP,US);
H10K59/873 (EP,CN);
G09G2300/0426 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0439 (US);
G09G2300/0819 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0232 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/11] | G09G3/32, G09G3/3233, G06F1/16, H01L51/52, H01L27/32 | ||
Former IPC [2017/23] | G09G3/32, G09G3/3233, G06F1/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/28] | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2017/23] | English: | DISPLAY APPARATUS | [2017/23] | French: | APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE | [2017/23] | Examination procedure | 25.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/28] | 26.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.03.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 08.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.08.2016 | AL | 17.04.2019 | AT | 17.04.2019 | CY | 17.04.2019 | CZ | 17.04.2019 | DK | 17.04.2019 | EE | 17.04.2019 | ES | 17.04.2019 | FI | 17.04.2019 | HR | 17.04.2019 | IT | 17.04.2019 | LT | 17.04.2019 | LV | 17.04.2019 | MC | 17.04.2019 | MK | 17.04.2019 | MT | 17.04.2019 | PL | 17.04.2019 | RO | 17.04.2019 | RS | 17.04.2019 | SE | 17.04.2019 | SI | 17.04.2019 | SK | 17.04.2019 | SM | 17.04.2019 | TR | 17.04.2019 | BG | 17.07.2019 | NO | 17.07.2019 | GR | 18.07.2019 | IS | 17.08.2019 | PT | 17.08.2019 | IE | 25.08.2019 | LU | 25.08.2019 | BE | 31.08.2019 | CH | 31.08.2019 | LI | 31.08.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 25.08.2016 | |
AL | 17.04.2019 | ||
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CY | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
MT | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
IE | 25.08.2019 | ||
LU | 25.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 25.08.2016 | |
AL | 17.04.2019 | ||
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CY | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
IE | 25.08.2019 | ||
LU | 25.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CY | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
IE | 25.08.2019 | ||
LU | 25.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
IE | 25.08.2019 | ||
LU | 25.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
IE | 25.08.2019 | ||
LU | 25.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
LU | 25.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 17.04.2019 | |
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 17.04.2019 | |
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP1672411 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US2009179880 (NAKAJIMA YOSHIHARU [JP], et al); | [A]US2013094126 (RAPPOPORT BENJAMIN M [US], et al); | [YA]WO2014141893 (SHARP KK [JP]); | [YP]US2016011633 (WATANABE HISASHI [JP], et al) |