EP3179406 - METHOD FOR INCREASING RELIABILITY IN MONITORING SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2018 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.07.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Axis AB Emdalavägen 14 223 69 Lund / SE | [2017/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHANSSON, Emanuel Gunnesbovägen 111 226 54 Lund / SE | [2017/24] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/24] | Awapatent AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 15199524.8 | 11.12.2015 | [2017/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3179406 | Date: | 14.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3179406 | Date: | 22.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, G08B13/196, G06T7/20 | [2017/31] | CPC: |
G08B13/196 (EP,US);
G06T7/70 (KR,US);
G06V40/103 (CN);
G06T7/11 (KR);
G06T7/20 (US);
G06T7/60 (KR);
G06V20/40 (CN);
G06V20/52 (EP,US);
H04N7/18 (CN);
H04N7/188 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/24] | G06K9/00, G08B13/196 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/24] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER ZUVERLÄSSIGKEIT IN ÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEMEN | [2017/24] | English: | METHOD FOR INCREASING RELIABILITY IN MONITORING SYSTEMS | [2017/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'AUGMENTATION DE LA FIABILITÉ DANS LES SYSTÈMES DE SURVEILLANCE | [2017/24] | Examination procedure | 11.12.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.08.2016 | Examination requested [2017/24] | 09.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/44] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.12.2015 | AL | 22.11.2017 | AT | 22.11.2017 | CY | 22.11.2017 | CZ | 22.11.2017 | DK | 22.11.2017 | EE | 22.11.2017 | ES | 22.11.2017 | FI | 22.11.2017 | HR | 22.11.2017 | IT | 22.11.2017 | LT | 22.11.2017 | LV | 22.11.2017 | MC | 22.11.2017 | MK | 22.11.2017 | NL | 22.11.2017 | PL | 22.11.2017 | PT | 22.11.2017 | RO | 22.11.2017 | RS | 22.11.2017 | SI | 22.11.2017 | SK | 22.11.2017 | SM | 22.11.2017 | TR | 22.11.2017 | IE | 11.12.2017 | LU | 11.12.2017 | MT | 11.12.2017 | BE | 31.12.2017 | BG | 22.02.2018 | NO | 22.02.2018 | GR | 23.02.2018 | IS | 22.03.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 11.12.2015 | |
AT | 22.11.2017 | ||
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
MK | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PT | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
TR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IE | 11.12.2017 | ||
LU | 11.12.2017 | ||
MT | 11.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | HU | 11.12.2015 | |
AT | 22.11.2017 | ||
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
MK | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
TR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IE | 11.12.2017 | ||
LU | 11.12.2017 | ||
MT | 11.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 11.12.2015 | |
AT | 22.11.2017 | ||
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
MK | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
IE | 11.12.2017 | ||
LU | 11.12.2017 | ||
MT | 11.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/41] | HU | 11.12.2015 | |
AT | 22.11.2017 | ||
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
IE | 11.12.2017 | ||
LU | 11.12.2017 | ||
MT | 11.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | HU | 11.12.2015 | |
AT | 22.11.2017 | ||
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
IE | 11.12.2017 | ||
LU | 11.12.2017 | ||
MT | 11.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 11.12.2015 | |
AT | 22.11.2017 | ||
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
IE | 11.12.2017 | ||
LU | 11.12.2017 | ||
MT | 11.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
IE | 11.12.2017 | ||
LU | 11.12.2017 | ||
MT | 11.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
IE | 11.12.2017 | ||
LU | 11.12.2017 | ||
MT | 11.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
IE | 11.12.2017 | ||
LU | 11.12.2017 | ||
MT | 11.12.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
LU | 11.12.2017 | ||
MT | 11.12.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 22.11.2017 | |
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102007058959 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0028] , [0040] *; | [XAI]WO2009126151 (UTC FIRE & SECURITY CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0030] , [0031] , [0046] , [0047] , [0048] * [A] 9,10 [I] 3,6,8; | [A]GB2484668 (INTELLIGENT DOOR SOLUTIONS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0019] - [0022] *; | [A]EP2607952 (AXIS AB [SE]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0038] - [0040] *; | [A]US2015043777 (TSAI CHIH-HSIANG [TW], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * figure 6 * * paragraphs [0025] , [0026] , [0043] , [0044] , [0053] *; | [A] - YUN ZHAI ET AL, "Virtual Boundary Crossing Detection without Explicit Object Tracking", ADVANCED VIDEO AND SIGNAL BASED SURVEILLANCE, 2009. AVSS '09. SIXTH IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090902), ISBN 978-1-4244-4755-8, pages 518 - 522, XP031542375 [A] 1-11 * page 520, paragraph 2.3. Tripwire Crossing Detection * | [A] - HAO LONG ET AL, "Fuzzy judgment algorithm based on security alarm system in the video surveillance", COMPUTER SCIENCE AND NETWORK TECHNOLOGY (ICCSNT), 2012 2ND INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20121229), doi:10.1109/ICCSNT.2012.6526240, ISBN 978-1-4673-2963-7, pages 1663 - 1666, XP032420152 [A] 1-11 * page 1664, paragraph III * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCSNT.2012.6526240 |