EP3223119 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ADJUSTING OBJECT ATTRIBUTE INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2022 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baidu Online Network Technology (Beijing) Co., Ltd. 3/F Baidu Campus No. 10, Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2017/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Junqi 3/F Baidu Campus No. 10 Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2017/39] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/10] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2017/39] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Engineering Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15861280.4 | 18.06.2015 | [2017/39] | WO2015CN81872 | Priority number, date | CN201410663111 | 19.11.2014 Original published format: CN201410663111 | [2017/39] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016078405 | Date: | 26.05.2016 | Language: | ZH | [2016/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3223119 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3223119 | Date: | 10.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 26.05.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0481, G06F3/0482, G06F3/0488, G06F1/16, H04M1/725, H04M19/04 | [2018/30] | CPC: |
G06F1/1686 (EP,US);
G06F3/0487 (CN);
G06F3/041 (US);
G06F1/1694 (EP,US);
G06F3/0346 (US);
G06F3/0481 (EP,US);
G06F3/0482 (EP,US);
G06F3/0484 (US);
G06F3/04886 (EP,US);
G06F3/04897 (US);
G06T7/20 (US);
H04M1/72454 (EP,US);
H04M19/04 (EP,US);
G06F2200/1637 (US);
G06F3/0488 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/39] | G06F3/041 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANPASSUNG VON OBJEKTEIGENSCHAFTSINFORMATIONEN | [2017/39] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ADJUSTING OBJECT ATTRIBUTE INFORMATION | [2017/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE RÉGLAGE D'INFORMATIONS D'ATTRIBUT D'OBJET | [2017/39] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2017 | Translation filed | 16.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2017 | Search fee paid | 16.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/39] | 16.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.01.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.12.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.06.2015 | AL | 10.03.2021 | AT | 10.03.2021 | CY | 10.03.2021 | CZ | 10.03.2021 | DK | 10.03.2021 | EE | 10.03.2021 | ES | 10.03.2021 | FI | 10.03.2021 | HR | 10.03.2021 | LT | 10.03.2021 | LV | 10.03.2021 | MC | 10.03.2021 | MK | 10.03.2021 | MT | 10.03.2021 | NL | 10.03.2021 | PL | 10.03.2021 | RO | 10.03.2021 | RS | 10.03.2021 | SE | 10.03.2021 | SI | 10.03.2021 | SK | 10.03.2021 | SM | 10.03.2021 | BG | 10.06.2021 | NO | 10.06.2021 | GR | 11.06.2021 | IE | 18.06.2021 | LU | 18.06.2021 | BE | 30.06.2021 | CH | 30.06.2021 | LI | 30.06.2021 | IS | 10.07.2021 | PT | 12.07.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 18.06.2015 | |
AL | 10.03.2021 | ||
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CY | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
MK | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IE | 18.06.2021 | ||
LU | 18.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 18.06.2015 | |
AL | 10.03.2021 | ||
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CY | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IE | 18.06.2021 | ||
LU | 18.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 18.06.2015 | |
AL | 10.03.2021 | ||
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IE | 18.06.2021 | ||
LU | 18.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IE | 18.06.2021 | ||
LU | 18.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IE | 18.06.2021 | ||
LU | 18.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IE | 18.06.2021 | ||
LU | 18.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
LU | 18.06.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2011043475 (RIGAZIO LUCA [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7-10,14-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0071] * [Y] 4-6,11-13; | [A]US2013288647 (TURGEMAN AVI [IL]) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0074] ** paragraph [0088] *; | [Y]US2013342672 (GRAY TIMOTHY T [US], et al) [Y] 4,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0045] *; | [A]CN103699882 (BEIJING BAIDU NETCOM SCI & TEC) [A] 1-16 * abstract *; | [Y]US2014143666 (KENNEDY SEAN P [US], et al) [Y] 5,6,12,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0060] *; | [A]US2014333524 (LIU CHANG [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0078] *; | [E]US2016266698 (WANG TIEBIN [CN], et al) [E] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0085] * | International search | [A]CN102221877 (MICROSOFT CORP) [A] 1-18 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN102306053 (TCL CORP) [A] 1-18 * , the whole document *; | [Y]CN102763059 (SONY COMP ENTERTAINMENT US) [Y] 1-18 * , paragraphs 12-14 of the description and figure 20 *; | [Y]CN103309593 (SHENZHEN FUTAIHONG PREC IND CO, et al) [Y] 1-18 * , paragraphs 41-42 of the description and figure 9 *; | [PX]CN104391646 (BAIDU ONLINE NETWORK TECHNOLOGY BEIJING CO LTD) [PX] 1-18* , claims 1-16 * |