EP3251548 - FILAMENT FOR AN ORAL CARE IMPLEMENT AND ORAL CARE IMPLEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV, PL, PT | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2017/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mark, Erwin Paul Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | 02 /
Kawerau, Jochen Erich Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg/Taunus / DE | 03 /
Alinski, Jens Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg/Taunus / DE | 04 /
Franke, Sven Alexander Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg/Taunus / DE | 05 /
Claire-Zimmet, Karen Lynn Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | 06 /
Jungnickel, Uwe Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg/Taunus / DE | [2017/49] | Representative(s) | P&G Patent Germany Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Straße 40 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [2024/07] |
Former [2017/49] | Töpert, Verena Clarita, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Patent Department Frankfurter Str. 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 16172798.7 | 03.06.2016 | [2017/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3251548 | Date: | 06.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3251548 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A46D1/00, A46D1/08, A46B9/04, A61C17/22, A61C17/34 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
A46D1/0238 (EP,KR,US);
A46B15/001 (US);
A46B9/04 (EP,KR,US);
A46D1/08 (EP,KR,US);
A61C17/222 (EP,US);
A61C17/3436 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/49] | A46D1/00, A46D1/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/27] |
Former [2017/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FILAMENT FÜR EINE MUNDPFLEGEVORRICHTUNG UND MUNDPFLEGEVORRICHTUNG | [2017/49] | English: | FILAMENT FOR AN ORAL CARE IMPLEMENT AND ORAL CARE IMPLEMENT | [2017/49] | French: | FILAMENT POUR UN INSTRUMENT DE SOINS BUCCAUX ET LEDIT INSTRUMENT | [2017/49] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/27] | 25.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.05.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.09.2023 | 26.09.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 10.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 20.07.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 20.07.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.07.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 14.02.2024 | FI | 14.02.2024 | HR | 14.02.2024 | LT | 14.02.2024 | LV | 14.02.2024 | PL | 14.02.2024 | NO | 14.05.2024 | RS | 14.05.2024 | GR | 15.05.2024 | IS | 14.06.2024 | PT | 14.06.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | BG | 14.02.2024 | |
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 14.02.2024 | |
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 14.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9709907 (CORONET WERKE GMBH [DE], et al); | [XY]WO9804167 (WHITEHILL ORAL TECH INC [US], et al); | [A]WO0001276 (BRAUN GMBH [DE], et al); | [Y]JP2001169829 (TORAY MONOFILAMENT CO); | [Y]WO03079849 (CORONET WERKE GMBH [DE], et al); | [Y]JP2005185399 (LION CORP); | [A]EP2918191 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) | Examination | JP2004202021 |