EP3273398 - METHOD FOR PROCESSING DATA BY AN ELECTRONIC DATA-ACQUISITION DEVICE, DEVICE AND CORRESPONDING PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.08.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Banks and Acquirers International Holding 28-32 boulevard de Grenelle 75015 Paris / FR | [2022/12] |
Former [2018/04] | For all designated states INGENICO GROUP 28-32 Boulevard de Grenelle 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEUNARDEAU, Marc 37 avenue de Loxendal 75015 Paris / FR | [2018/04] | Representative(s) | Vidon Brevets & Stratégie 16B, rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | [2021/50] |
Former [2018/04] | Vidon Brevets & Stratégie 16B, rue de Jouanet B.P. 90333 Technopole Atalante 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | Application number, filing date | 17182194.5 | 19.07.2017 | [2018/04] | Priority number, date | FR20160056960 | 21.07.2016 Original published format: FR 1656960 | [2018/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3273398 | Date: | 24.01.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3273398 | Date: | 15.12.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04B5/00, H04W12/06, H04W12/08, H04W4/80, G06Q20/32, G06Q20/34, H04K1/00 | [2021/09] | CPC: |
H04B5/77 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3227 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3278 (EP,US);
G06Q20/352 (EP,US);
H04K1/003 (EP,US);
H04W12/06 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/04] | G06Q20/32, G06Q20/34, H04K1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/34] |
Former [2018/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DATENVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN MITHILFE EINER ELEKTRONISCHEN VORRICHTUNG ZUR DATENERFASSUNG, VORRICHTUNG UND ENTSPRECHENDES PROGRAMM | [2018/04] | English: | METHOD FOR PROCESSING DATA BY AN ELECTRONIC DATA-ACQUISITION DEVICE, DEVICE AND CORRESPONDING PROGRAM | [2018/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES PAR UN DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE D'ACQUISITION DE DONNÉES, DISPOSITIF ET PROGRAMME CORRESPONDANT | [2018/04] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/34] | 06.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.04.2020 | 20.04.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 25.09.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.10.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 11.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.08.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.07.2017 | AL | 15.12.2021 | AT | 15.12.2021 | CY | 15.12.2021 | CZ | 15.12.2021 | DK | 15.12.2021 | EE | 15.12.2021 | FI | 15.12.2021 | HR | 15.12.2021 | IT | 15.12.2021 | LT | 15.12.2021 | LV | 15.12.2021 | MC | 15.12.2021 | MK | 15.12.2021 | MT | 15.12.2021 | PL | 15.12.2021 | RO | 15.12.2021 | RS | 15.12.2021 | SE | 15.12.2021 | SI | 15.12.2021 | SK | 15.12.2021 | SM | 15.12.2021 | TR | 15.12.2021 | BG | 15.03.2022 | NO | 15.03.2022 | GR | 16.03.2022 | IS | 15.04.2022 | PT | 18.04.2022 | IE | 19.07.2022 | LU | 19.07.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 19.07.2017 | |
AL | 15.12.2021 | ||
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CY | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
IT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
MK | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
TR | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
IE | 19.07.2022 | ||
LU | 19.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 19.07.2017 | |
AL | 15.12.2021 | ||
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CY | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
IT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
MK | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
IE | 19.07.2022 | ||
LU | 19.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 19.07.2017 | |
AL | 15.12.2021 | ||
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CY | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
IT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
IE | 19.07.2022 | ||
LU | 19.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 19.07.2017 | |
AL | 15.12.2021 | ||
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
IT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
IE | 19.07.2022 | ||
LU | 19.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 15.12.2021 | |
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
IT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
IE | 19.07.2022 | ||
LU | 19.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 15.12.2021 | |
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
IT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
LU | 19.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 15.12.2021 | |
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
LU | 19.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AL | 15.12.2021 | |
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 15.12.2021 | |
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 15.12.2021 | |
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 15.12.2021 | |
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 15.12.2021 | |
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 15.12.2021 | |
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | CZ | 15.12.2021 | |
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | EE | 15.12.2021 | |
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | FI | 15.12.2021 | |
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | FI | 15.12.2021 | |
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | FI | 15.12.2021 | |
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | FI | 15.12.2021 | |
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 15.12.2021 | |
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 15.03.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2652698 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [FR], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2, paragraph last - page 3, paragraph 1 * * page 4 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5181246 (MIKI TSUTOMU [JP]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * column 1, paragraph 1 - column 3, paragraph last * * column 6, paragraph 3 - column 7, paragraph 2 * * column 8, paragraph last - column 9, paragraph 1 * * figures 4-6 *; | [I]WO2004012352 (WAY SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [I] 1-12 * page 9, paragraph 5 - page 11, paragraph 1 * * figures 1,3,4 *; | [A]EP2574098 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0082] * * figures 3-4,7 *; | [A]US2015007310 (TRUSKOVSKY ALEXANDER [CA], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0084] * * figures 5-6 *; | [A]EP2833659 (BLACKBERRY LTD [CA]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0040] * * figures 1-4 *; | [A] - Anonymous, "Near field communication - Wikipedia, the free encyclopedia", (20150207), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Near_field_communication&oldid=646058855, (20160525), XP055275510 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | Examination | US2292387 |