EP3357739 - DEVICE FOR CHARGING AN ELECTRICAL ENERGY STORAGE DEVICE OF A VEHICLE WITH AN ELECTRICAL DRIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.02.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Truck & Bus SE Dachauer Straße 667 80995 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/29] | For all designated states MAN Truck & Bus SE Dachauer Strasse 667 80995 München / DE | ||
Former [2018/32] | For all designated states MAN Truck & Bus AG Dachauer Straße 667 80995 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Antwerpen, Korbinian Alleestr.19 D/85716 Unterschleissheim / DE | [2018/32] | Representative(s) | Liebl, Thomas Neubauer - Liebl - Bierschneider - Massinger Münchener Straße 49 85051 Ingolstadt / DE | [2023/19] |
Former [2018/32] | Liebl, Thomas Neubauer - Liebl - Bierschneider Patentanwälte Münchener Straße 49 85051 Ingolstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 18154079.0 | 30.01.2018 | [2018/32] | Priority number, date | DE20171000916 | 02.02.2017 Original published format: DE102017000916 | [2018/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3357739 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3357739 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B60L53/14, B60M7/00, B60L5/42, B60L53/30 | [2022/46] | CPC: |
B60M7/003 (EP,US);
B60L5/42 (EP);
B60L53/14 (EP,US);
B60L53/32 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
Y02T10/7072 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2018/32] | B60L11/18, B60M7/00, B60L5/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/12] |
Former [2018/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFLADEN EINES ELEKTRISCHEN ENERGIESPEICHERS EINES EINEN ELEKTRISCHEN ANTRIEB AUFWEISENDEN FAHRZEUGS | [2018/32] | English: | DEVICE FOR CHARGING AN ELECTRICAL ENERGY STORAGE DEVICE OF A VEHICLE WITH AN ELECTRICAL DRIVE | [2018/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CHARGEMENT D'UN ACCUMULATEUR D'ÉNERGIE ÉLECTRIQUE D'UN VÉHICULE COMPORTANT UN ENTRAÎNEMENT ÉLECTRIQUE | [2018/32] | Examination procedure | 07.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/12] | 07.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 10.05.2023 | DK | 10.05.2023 | EE | 10.05.2023 | ES | 10.05.2023 | FI | 10.05.2023 | HR | 10.05.2023 | LT | 10.05.2023 | LV | 10.05.2023 | MC | 10.05.2023 | PL | 10.05.2023 | RO | 10.05.2023 | RS | 10.05.2023 | SI | 10.05.2023 | SK | 10.05.2023 | SM | 10.05.2023 | NO | 10.08.2023 | GR | 11.08.2023 | IS | 10.09.2023 | PT | 11.09.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/24] | CZ | 10.05.2023 | |
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SI | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 10.05.2023 | |
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 10.05.2023 | |
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | ES | 10.05.2023 | |
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | ES | 10.05.2023 | |
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 10.05.2023 | |
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 10.05.2023 | |
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 10.05.2023 | |
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 10.05.2023 | |
PT | 11.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN204383201U (BEIJING CED RAILWAY ELECTRIC TECH CO LTD) [A] 1,3,12 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0003]; figures 1, 3a, 3b *; | [A]DE102014213831 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,7,12 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0008] ** paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0041]; figure 1 *; | [X]DE102014226357 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,11,12 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0006]; claims 1, 12 * * paragraph [0050]; figure 3 *; | [X]US2016185239 (WEIGEL WILFRIED [DE], et al) [X] 1,11,12 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0067]; figures 1-9, 11 *; | [IA]EP3115248 (SYLVAN ASCENT INC [US]) [I] 1-3,7,8,10-12 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0057]; figures 1-4 * [A] 4-6,9 | Examination | CN101580022 | GB2518129 | WO2015173036 |