EP3361752 - HEARING AID DEVICE HAVING WIRELESS COMMUNICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oticon A/S Kongebakken 9 2765 Smørum / DK | [2024/15] |
Former [2018/33] | For all designated states Oticon A/S Kongebakken 9 2765 Smørum / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SØ, Rune c/o Oticon A/S Kongebakken 9 2765 Smørum / DK | 02 /
THOUGAARD, Morten c/o Oticon A/S Kongebakken 9 2765 Smørum / DK | 03 /
SCHAUB, Stefan c/o Bernafon AG Morgenstrasse 131 3018 Berne / CH | [2018/33] | Representative(s) | Demant Demant A/S Kongebakken 9 2765 Smørum / DK | [2024/15] |
Former [2018/33] | William Demant Oticon A/S Kongebakken 9 2765 Smørum / DK | Application number, filing date | 18156038.4 | 09.02.2018 | [2018/33] | Priority number, date | EP20170155380 | 09.02.2017 Original published format: EP 17155380 | [2018/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3361752 | Date: | 15.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3361752 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00 | [2018/33] | CPC: |
H04R25/554 (EP,CN,US);
H04R25/50 (CN);
H04R25/602 (US);
H04R25/65 (US);
H02J50/10 (US);
H04R2225/31 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/13] |
Former [2018/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HÖRHILFEGERÄT MIT DRAHTLOSER KOMMUNIKATION | [2018/33] | English: | HEARING AID DEVICE HAVING WIRELESS COMMUNICATION | [2018/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AIDE AUDITIVE AYANT UNE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2018/33] | Examination procedure | 15.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/13] | 15.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 06.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 31.08.2023 | 31.08.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 14.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24157275.9 / EP4362500 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 06.10.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 06.10.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.10.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2006093174 (NIEDERDRANK TORSTEN [DE], et al); | [A]US2007183614 (KASZTELAN THOMAS [DE], et al); | [A]US2008205678 (BOGUSLAVSKIJ MIHAIL [DE], et al); | [X]US2008212812 (CHAN HOONG YIH [SG], et al); | [A]US2009231211 (ZWEERS JAN-WILLEM [NL]) |