EP3409241 - CUSTOMIZABLE AUGMENTS FOR ACETABULAR IMPLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.06.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zimmer, Inc. 1800 West Center Street Warsaw, IN 46580 / US | [2018/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCPHERSON, Edward J. Warsaw, IN 46580 / US | 02 /
MACKE, Jacob Warsaw, IN 46580 / US | [2023/36] |
Former [2023/14] | 01 /
McPherson, Edward J. Warsaw, IN 46580 / US | ||
02 /
MACKE, Jacob Warsaw, IN 46580 / US | |||
Former [2018/49] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Taor, Simon Edward William, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/49] | Mays, Julie, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London, EC1A 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 18175381.5 | 31.05.2018 | [2018/49] | Priority number, date | US201762512904P | 31.05.2017 Original published format: US 201762512904 P | [2018/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3409241 | Date: | 05.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3409241 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/30, A61F2/34 | [2018/49] | CPC: |
A61F2/30734 (EP,US);
A61F2/30771 (US);
A61F2/34 (EP,US);
A61F2/30749 (US);
A61F2/30942 (US);
A61F2002/30024 (US);
A61F2002/30131 (US);
A61F2002/30176 (US);
A61F2002/30181 (US);
A61F2002/30433 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30449 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30561 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30578 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30617 (US);
A61F2002/30688 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3069 (US);
A61F2002/30736 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30784 (US);
A61F2002/3092 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3093 (US);
A61F2002/3096 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30968 (US);
A61F2002/3097 (US);
A61F2002/30985 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00023 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/29] |
Former [2018/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ANPASSBARE VERGRÖSSERUNGEN FÜR ACETABULÄRE IMPLANTATE | [2018/49] | English: | CUSTOMIZABLE AUGMENTS FOR ACETABULAR IMPLANTS | [2018/49] | French: | AJOUTS PERSONNALISABLES POUR IMPLANTS ACÉTABULAIRES | [2018/49] | Examination procedure | 05.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/29] | 05.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.09.2023 | CZ | 06.09.2023 | DK | 06.09.2023 | EE | 06.09.2023 | ES | 06.09.2023 | FI | 06.09.2023 | HR | 06.09.2023 | IT | 06.09.2023 | LT | 06.09.2023 | LV | 06.09.2023 | NL | 06.09.2023 | PL | 06.09.2023 | RO | 06.09.2023 | RS | 06.09.2023 | SE | 06.09.2023 | SI | 06.09.2023 | SK | 06.09.2023 | SM | 06.09.2023 | NO | 06.12.2023 | GR | 07.12.2023 | IS | 06.01.2024 | PT | 08.01.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/33] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 06.09.2023 | |
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2960418 (EVOLUTIS [FR]) [A] 1-11* page 3, line 18 - page 4, line 6 *; | [XYI]WO2011156504 (SMITH & NEPHEW INC [US], et al) [X] 1-6,9,10 * paragraphs [0161] , [0166] , [0307] , [0313] * [Y] 7,8 [I] 11; | [Y]WO2015187038 (OSSIS LTD [NZ]) [Y] 7,8 * page 17, lines 16-24 * * page 21, line 31 - page 22, line 4 *; | [A]WO2017005514 (LINK WALDEMAR GMBH CO [DE]) [A] 1-11 * page 17, line 31 - page 19, line 5 * | by applicant | US5282861 | - LEVINE, B.R. et al., "Experimental and Clinical Performance of Porous Tantalum in Orthopedic Surgery", Biomaterials, (20060000), vol. 27, doi:doi:10.1016/j.biomaterials.2006.04.041, pages 4671 - 4681, XP025097469 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biomaterials.2006.04.041 |