EP3411664 - EFFICIENT AND ERROR TOLERANT MAPPING FROM A SOURCE GRAPH TO A TARGET GRAPH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2022 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.05.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.08.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HERE Global B.V. De Run 1115 5503 LB Veldhoven / NL | [2018/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROLF, Daniel Dehmelstr.16 13156 Berlin / DE | [2018/50] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2018/50] | Application number, filing date | 17705735.3 | 01.02.2017 | [2018/50] | WO2017US15945 | Priority number, date | US201615012506 | 01.02.2016 Original published format: US201615012506 | [2018/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017136388 | Date: | 10.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3411664 | Date: | 12.12.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3411664 | Date: | 10.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/29, G01C21/32 | [2021/12] | CPC: |
G01C21/387 (EP,US);
G01C21/30 (US);
G01C21/3446 (US);
G01C21/3667 (US);
G06F16/29 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/50] | G01C21/32, G06F17/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EFFIZIENTE UND FEHLERTOLERANTE ABBILDUNG VON EINEM QUELLGRAPHEN AUF EINEN ZIELGRAPHEN | [2021/12] | English: | EFFICIENT AND ERROR TOLERANT MAPPING FROM A SOURCE GRAPH TO A TARGET GRAPH | [2018/50] | French: | APPLICATION EFFICACE ET TOLÉRANTE AUX ERREURS D'UN GRAPHE SOURCE À UN GRAPHE CIBLE | [2021/12] |
Former [2018/50] | EFFIZIENTE UND FEHLERTOLERANTE ZUORDNUNG VON EINER QUELLGRAFIK ZU EINER ZIELGRAFIK | ||
Former [2018/50] | CARTOGRAPHIE EFFICACE ET TOLÉRANTE AUX ERREURS D'UN GRAPHIQUE SOURCE À UN GRAPHIQUE CIBLE | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/50] | 23.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.09.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.02.2017 | AL | 10.11.2021 | AT | 10.11.2021 | CY | 10.11.2021 | CZ | 10.11.2021 | DK | 10.11.2021 | EE | 10.11.2021 | ES | 10.11.2021 | FI | 10.11.2021 | HR | 10.11.2021 | IT | 10.11.2021 | LT | 10.11.2021 | LV | 10.11.2021 | MC | 10.11.2021 | MK | 10.11.2021 | MT | 10.11.2021 | PL | 10.11.2021 | RO | 10.11.2021 | RS | 10.11.2021 | SE | 10.11.2021 | SI | 10.11.2021 | SK | 10.11.2021 | SM | 10.11.2021 | IE | 01.02.2022 | LU | 01.02.2022 | BG | 10.02.2022 | GB | 10.02.2022 | NO | 10.02.2022 | GR | 11.02.2022 | BE | 28.02.2022 | CH | 28.02.2022 | LI | 28.02.2022 | IS | 10.03.2022 | PT | 10.03.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 01.02.2017 | |
AL | 10.11.2021 | ||
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CY | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
IT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
MK | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
IE | 01.02.2022 | ||
LU | 01.02.2022 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
GB | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 01.02.2017 | |
AL | 10.11.2021 | ||
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CY | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
IT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
IE | 01.02.2022 | ||
LU | 01.02.2022 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
GB | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 01.02.2017 | |
AL | 10.11.2021 | ||
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
IT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
IE | 01.02.2022 | ||
LU | 01.02.2022 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
GB | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 10.11.2021 | |
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
IT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
IE | 01.02.2022 | ||
LU | 01.02.2022 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
GB | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 10.11.2021 | |
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
IE | 01.02.2022 | ||
LU | 01.02.2022 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
GB | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 10.11.2021 | |
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
IE | 01.02.2022 | ||
LU | 01.02.2022 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
GB | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 10.11.2021 | |
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
IE | 01.02.2022 | ||
LU | 01.02.2022 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
GB | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 10.11.2021 | |
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
LU | 01.02.2022 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 10.11.2021 | |
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
LU | 01.02.2022 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
LU | 01.02.2022 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 10.02.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6728631 (HESSING BERND [DE]) [A] 1-20* figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO2008010699 (TELE ATLAS N V [NL], et al) [A] 1-20 * page 15, line 30 - page 16, line 1 * | Examination | - TOMTOM, "OpenLR?. An open standard for encoding, transmitting and decoding location references in digital maps", WHITE PAPER TOMTOM,, (20090101), no. Version 1.0, pages 1 - 47, XP007920769 |