EP3413829 - SYSTEMS OF POSE ESTIMATION AND CALIBRATION OF PERSPECTIVE IMAGING SYSTEM IN IMAGE GUIDED SURGERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/51] | SYSTEMS AND METHODS OF POSE ESTIMATION AND CALIBRATION OF PERSPECTIVE IMAGING SYSTEM IN IMAGE GUIDED SURGERY | ||
[2024/01] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intuitive Surgical Operations, Inc. 1020 Kifer Road Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | [2024/21] |
Former [2018/51] | For all designated states Intuitive Surgical Operations, Inc. 1020 Kifer Road Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOPER, Timothy D. c/o Intuitive Surgical Operations, Inc. 1020 Kifer Road Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | 02 /
BARBAGLI, Federico c/o Intuitive Surgical Operations, Inc. 1020 Kifer Road Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | 03 /
DONHOWE, Caitlin Q. 936 Madison Drive Mountain View California 94040 / US | 04 /
DUINDAM, Vincent c/o Intuitive Surgical Operations, Inc. 1020 Kifer Road Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | 05 /
PARIS, Michael D. 3963 23rd Street San Francisco California 94114 / US | 06 /
WAGNER, Oliver c/o Intuitive Surgical Operations, Inc. 1020 Kifer Road Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | 07 /
ZHAO, Tao c/o Intuitive Surgical Operations, Inc. 1020 Kifer Road Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | [2018/51] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2024/21] |
Former [2018/51] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 17750840.5 | 10.02.2017 | [2018/51] | WO2017US17391 | Priority number, date | US201662294845P | 12.02.2016 Original published format: US 201662294845 P | US201662294857P | 12.02.2016 Original published format: US 201662294857 P | [2018/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017139591 | Date: | 17.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3413829 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3413829 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.08.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61B34/20, A61B90/00, A61B6/02, A61B6/12, A61B6/00, G06T7/70, G06T7/80, // A61B17/00, A61B34/10, A61B6/03 | [2024/01] | CPC: |
G06T7/80 (EP);
A61B90/36 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B34/10 (CN,US);
A61B34/20 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/00 (CN);
A61B34/35 (EP,CN,US);
A61B6/025 (EP,CN,US);
A61B6/032 (EP,CN,US);
A61B6/12 (EP,CN,US);
A61B6/4441 (EP,CN,US);
A61B6/487 (EP,CN,US);
A61B6/547 (EP,CN,US);
A61B6/582 (EP,CN,US);
A61B90/39 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06T7/70 (EP);
A61B2017/00725 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00809 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2034/105 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2034/107 (CN,US);
A61B2034/2051 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2034/2055 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2034/2059 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2034/2061 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2034/207 (CN,US);
A61B2090/363 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B2090/364 (CN,KR);
A61B2090/367 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2090/3735 (CN,US);
A61B2090/376 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2090/3937 (CN,KR);
|
Former IPC [2019/41] | A61B90/00, A61B6/02, A61B34/20 | ||
Former IPC [2018/51] | A61B90/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME ZUR POSENSCHÄTZUNG UND KALIBRIERUNG VON PERSPEKTIVISCHEN BILDGEBUNGSSYSTEMEN IN DER BILDGEFÜHRTEN CHIRURGIE | [2024/01] | English: | SYSTEMS OF POSE ESTIMATION AND CALIBRATION OF PERSPECTIVE IMAGING SYSTEM IN IMAGE GUIDED SURGERY | [2024/01] | French: | SYSTÈMES D'ESTIMATION DE POSE ET D'ÉTALONNAGE DE SYSTÈME D'IMAGERIE EN PERSPECTIVE DANS UNE CHIRURGIE GUIDÉE PAR IMAGE | [2024/01] |
Former [2018/51] | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR POSENSCHÄTZUNG UND -KALIBRIERUNG VON VERFAHREN ZUR PERSPEKTIVISCHEN BILDGEBUNG IN BILDGEFÜHRTER CHIRURGIE | ||
Former [2018/51] | SYSTEMS AND METHODS OF POSE ESTIMATION AND CALIBRATION OF PERSPECTIVE IMAGING SYSTEM IN IMAGE GUIDED SURGERY | ||
Former [2018/51] | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'ESTIMATION DE POSE ET D'ÉTALONNAGE DE SYSTÈME D'IMAGERIE EN PERSPECTIVE DANS UNE CHIRURGIE GUIDÉE PAR IMAGE | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2018 | Search fee paid | 14.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/51] | 19.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24169394.4 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1504726 (MEDTRONIC SURGICAL NAVIGATION [US]); | [A]US2005281385 (JOHNSON DOUGLAS K [US], et al); | [YA]US2011116693 (LI DUN ALEX [US], et al); | [A]WO2013016286 (BRONCUS MEDICAL INC [US], et al); | [A]US2013090552 (RAMAMURTHY BHASKAR S [US], et al); | [IY]US2014276937 (WONG SERENA [US], et al); | [A]US2014275997 (CHOPRA PRASHANT [US], et al); | International search | [A]WO0187136 (VISUALIZATION TECHNOLOGY [US]); | [A]US6714810 (GRZESZCZUK ROBERT [US], et al); | [A]EP1421913 (SURGICAL NAVIGATION TECH [US]); | [A]US2005117708 (CHO YOUNG-BIN [CA], et al); | [XY]US2011116693 (LI DUN ALEX [US], et al); | [XY]WO2016018646 (INTUITIVE SURGICAL OPERATIONS [US]) | Examination | WO2015010859 | by applicant | US6288783 | US6380732 | US6389187 | EP1504726 | US2005281385 | US7316681 | US2010168562 | US2011116693 | WO2013016286 | US2014276937 | US19400622054 | US19330622054 | US20050180389 | US20080047056 | US20080286644 |