EP3417744 - REST ASSEMBLY FOR RECOVERING THE GEOELECTRIC FIELD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.2021 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jiménez Castillo, Rosa C/ Cristóbal Colón 23 18101 Belicena (Granada) / ES | [2021/04] |
Former [2018/52] | For all designated states Jiménez Castillo, Rosa C/ Cristóbal Colón 23 18101 Belicena (Granada) / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2018/52] | Representative(s) | Sahuquillo Huerta, Jesús Jesana Patentes, SL Jesana iP C/ Huesca 5 ,Oficina 2 46001 Valencia / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2021/04] | Sahuquillo Huerta, Jesús Jesana Patentes, SL Jesana IP C/ Reverendo José Noguera 33-14 46017 Valencia / ES | ||
Former [2018/52] | Munoz Garcia, Antonio Consiangar, S.L. Albasanz, 72 1º-1 28037 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 17752723.1 | 10.02.2017 | [2018/52] | WO2017ES70077 | Priority number, date | ES20160030190 | 19.02.2016 Original published format: ES 201630190 | [2018/52] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017140931 | Date: | 24.08.2017 | Language: | ES | [2017/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3417744 | Date: | 26.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3417744 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 24.08.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A47C31/00 | [2020/33] | CPC: |
A47C27/15 (EP);
A47C27/122 (EP,ES);
A47C31/004 (EP,ES);
A61N1/14 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2018/52] | A47C27/15, A61N1/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RASTANORDNUNG ZUR WIEDERHERSTELLUNG DES GEOELEKTRISCHEN FELDES | [2018/52] | English: | REST ASSEMBLY FOR RECOVERING THE GEOELECTRIC FIELD | [2018/52] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE LITERIE POUR LA RÉCUPÉRATION DU CHAMP GÉOÉLECTRIQUE | [2018/52] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2018 | Translation filed | 06.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2018 | Search fee paid | 06.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/52] | 25.08.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.12.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.02.2017 | AL | 27.01.2021 | AT | 27.01.2021 | CY | 27.01.2021 | CZ | 27.01.2021 | EE | 27.01.2021 | FI | 27.01.2021 | HR | 27.01.2021 | LT | 27.01.2021 | LV | 27.01.2021 | MC | 27.01.2021 | MK | 27.01.2021 | MT | 27.01.2021 | NL | 27.01.2021 | RO | 27.01.2021 | RS | 27.01.2021 | SI | 27.01.2021 | SK | 27.01.2021 | SM | 27.01.2021 | IE | 10.02.2021 | LU | 10.02.2021 | ES | 11.02.2021 | BG | 27.04.2021 | NO | 27.04.2021 | GR | 28.04.2021 | IS | 27.05.2021 | PT | 27.05.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 10.02.2017 | |
AL | 27.01.2021 | ||
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CY | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
MK | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
IE | 10.02.2021 | ||
LU | 10.02.2021 | ||
ES | 11.02.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 10.02.2017 | |
AL | 27.01.2021 | ||
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CY | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
IE | 10.02.2021 | ||
LU | 10.02.2021 | ||
ES | 11.02.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CY | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
IE | 10.02.2021 | ||
LU | 10.02.2021 | ||
ES | 11.02.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
IE | 10.02.2021 | ||
LU | 10.02.2021 | ||
ES | 11.02.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
IE | 10.02.2021 | ||
LU | 10.02.2021 | ||
ES | 11.02.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
IE | 10.02.2021 | ||
LU | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
IE | 10.02.2021 | ||
LU | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
IE | 10.02.2021 | ||
LU | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
IE | 10.02.2021 | ||
LU | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
LU | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
LU | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
LU | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 27.01.2021 | |
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 27.01.2021 | |
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 27.01.2021 | |
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]KR20050007260 (KIM HOOI BOO) [A] 1-4* abstract *; | [A]US2010064433 (MORA JIMENEZ GREGORIO [ES]) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0010] , [0 12]; figures 1-2 *; | [A]US2015226278 (VOROS GABOR [HU], et al) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0070] , [ 109] , [ 115]; figures 1-3 * | International search | [X]WO2008087225 (BIOVITAL SORT S L [ES], et al) [X] 1-4 * , Pág. 3 lin. 20-25 y 33, pág. 4 lin 1-5 y 32-33, pág. 5, lin. 1-18 y pág. 10, lin. 8-12 *; | WO2009091345 [ ] (ISTIKBAL MOBILYA SANAYI VE TIC [TR], et al); | CN203538932U [ ] (WANG QIGUANG); | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 2009-L86176, XP055411474 [A] 1-4 | [A] - ULTRACONFORT TEJIDO DE BAMBU, (20121004), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20121024100844/ http://ultraconfort.es/contents/view/3/calidad- y-tecnologias, XP055574834 [A] 1 | [A] - HIMALAYAN CRYSTAL SALTS PILLOW, (20120502), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20120502103458/ http://www. natural -salt- lamps.com/ natural -pain-relief-therapy.html, XP055574877 [A] 1 | [A] - Anonymous, "Crystal Royal Mattresses. Platinum", Crystal Royal Mattresses, (20150719), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20150719151116/http://www.crystalroyalmattresses.com/?page=mattresses-platinum, XP009512757 [A] 1 | [A] - "LX Himalayan Salt Spa Treatment Massage Table", HYMALAYAN SALT SPA, Pacoima (California), (20151017), pages 1 - 6, URL: https://web.archive.org//web/20151017213529/http://www.spaandequipment.com/LX-Himalayan-Salt-Spa-Treatment-Massage-Table.html, XP009512766 [A] 1 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 2014-K95031, XP055411481 [A] 1 | [A] - GOFLOR COLCHON BAMBU, (20150223), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20150223012556/ http:/lugotexsl.com/virtuemart/medical/anti-alergia/anti-microbiano-bambu-100- natural -sanitario/colchon-bambu-tejido-100- natural, XP055574920 [A] 1 |