EP3429185 - METHOD, DEVICE AND APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING FOCUS WINDOW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2019/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DU, Cheng Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
LUO, Wei Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
GUO, Xin Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
RONG, Huaiyang Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 05 /
WU, Jin Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2019/03] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2019/03] | Application number, filing date | 16895857.7 | 29.03.2016 | [2019/03] | WO2016CN77734 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017166076 | Date: | 05.10.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3429185 | Date: | 16.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3429185 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 05.10.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/232 | [2019/03] | CPC: |
H04N23/675 (EP,US);
H04N23/673 (EP,US);
H04N23/611 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND EINRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINES FOKUSFENSTERS | [2019/03] | English: | METHOD, DEVICE AND APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING FOCUS WINDOW | [2019/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE DÉTERMINER UNE FENÊTRE DE MISE AU POINT | [2019/03] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2018 | Translation filed | 11.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 11.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/03] | 06.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.05.2023 | CZ | 10.05.2023 | DK | 10.05.2023 | EE | 10.05.2023 | ES | 10.05.2023 | FI | 10.05.2023 | HR | 10.05.2023 | IT | 10.05.2023 | LT | 10.05.2023 | LV | 10.05.2023 | NL | 10.05.2023 | PL | 10.05.2023 | RO | 10.05.2023 | RS | 10.05.2023 | SE | 10.05.2023 | SI | 10.05.2023 | SK | 10.05.2023 | SM | 10.05.2023 | NO | 10.08.2023 | GR | 11.08.2023 | IS | 10.09.2023 | PT | 11.09.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SI | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 10.05.2023 | |
PT | 11.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2007064145 (SUGIMOTO MASAHIKO [JP]) [I] 1-3,7-9 * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0123] * * paragraph [0176] * * paragraph [0239] - paragraph [0243] * * paragraph [0253] - paragraph [0255] * * paragraph [0259] - paragraph [0267] * * paragraph [0288] *; | [XA]CN104270562 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMM) [X] 4,5,10,11 * abstract * * claim 1 *[A] 1-3,7-9; | [T] - Anonymous, "Autofocus - Wikipedia, the free encyclopedia", (20151106), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20151106000426/https://en.wikipedia.org/wiki/Autofocus, (20190131), XP055549767 [T] * section 4.2 * | International search | [A]US2008074529 (TERASHIMA YOSHITO [JP]) [A] 1-18 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN101806949 (CANON KK) [A] 1-18 * , description, paragraphs 0111-0115 and 0136 *; | [A]CN101808197 (CANON KK) [A] 1-18* , the whole document *; | [A]CN103858043 (CANON KK) [A] 1-18 * , the whole document *; | [A]US2014362278 (KAWARADA MASAHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-18 * , description, paragraphs 0050-0071 *; | [A]CN104243825 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMM) [A] 1-18 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN104270562 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMM) [A] 1-18 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN105210018 (SONY CORP) [A] 1-18 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN105357444 (NUBIA TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-18 * , the whole document * | Examination | US2008074529 |