EP3431375 - DAMPER CONTROL DEVICE AND SUSPENSION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KYB Corporation World Trade Center Building 4-1, Hamamatsu-cho 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6111 / JP | [2019/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AWANO, Koichiro c/o KYB Corporation World Trade Center Bldg. 4-1, Hamamatsu-cho 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6111 / JP | 02 /
MOCHIZUKI, Mitsuteru c/o KYB Corporation World Trade Center Bldg. 4-1, Hamamatsu-cho 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6111 / JP | [2019/04] | Representative(s) | MFG Patentanwälte Meyer-Wildhagen Meggle-Freund Gerhard PartG mbB Amalienstraße 62 80799 München / DE | [2019/04] | Application number, filing date | 17766373.9 | 01.03.2017 | [2019/04] | WO2017JP08159 | Priority number, date | JP20160053224 | 17.03.2016 Original published format: JP 2016053224 | [2019/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017159370 | Date: | 21.09.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3431375 | Date: | 23.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3431375 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.09.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F16F9/46, F16F9/32, B60G17/0165, B62K25/08, // F16F9/19, B62K25/04 | [2023/08] | CPC: |
B60G17/0165 (EP,US);
F16F9/50 (US);
B62K25/04 (US);
B62K25/08 (EP);
F16F9/19 (EP,US);
F16F9/3292 (EP,US);
F16F9/46 (EP,US);
B60G2300/12 (EP,US);
B60G2400/252 (EP,US);
B60G2500/10 (EP,US);
B62K2025/044 (US);
B62K2025/045 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/43] | F16F9/46, F16F9/32, B60G17/0165, B62K25/06, // F16F9/19 | ||
Former IPC [2019/04] | B62K25/04, F16F9/19, F16F9/46, F16F9/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DÄMPFERREGELVORRICHTUNG UND AUFHÄNGEVORRICHTUNG | [2019/04] | English: | DAMPER CONTROL DEVICE AND SUSPENSION DEVICE | [2019/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'AMORTISSEUR ET DISPOSITIF DE SUSPENSION | [2019/04] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2018 | Translation filed | 08.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 08.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/04] | 09.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 30.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 09.08.2023 | DK | 09.08.2023 | EE | 09.08.2023 | ES | 09.08.2023 | FI | 09.08.2023 | HR | 09.08.2023 | LT | 09.08.2023 | LV | 09.08.2023 | NL | 09.08.2023 | PL | 09.08.2023 | RO | 09.08.2023 | RS | 09.08.2023 | SI | 09.08.2023 | SK | 09.08.2023 | SM | 09.08.2023 | NO | 09.11.2023 | GR | 10.11.2023 | IS | 09.12.2023 | PT | 11.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 09.08.2023 | |
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 09.08.2023 | |
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 09.08.2023 | |
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 09.08.2023 | |
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 09.08.2023 | |
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 09.08.2023 | |
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH02182518 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-5* figures 1-7 *; | [A]JPH0411511 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-5 * figures 1-6 *; | [A]US6360148 (HALPIN MICHAEL W [US]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * column 1, line 6 - line 14 * * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 6 * * column 3, line 30 - line 36 * * column 4, line 10 - line 24 *; | [X]WO03040586 (KONI BV [NL], et al) [X] 1,3,5 * figures 1, 2, 3 * * page 1, lines 3-15 and 26-31 * * page 2, line 18 - line 21 * * page 5, line 18 - line 22 * * page 7, line 11 - line 13 *; | [X]US2004124049 (ST CLAIR KENNETH A [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003], [0030], [0032] and [0040]-[0042] *; | [A]US2005167943 (INABA KAZUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002], [0005], [0006]-[0016] * | International search | [A]JPS6395991U (Suzuki Motor Co., Ltd.) [A] 1-5* , specification, page 1, line 16 to page 2, line 5; page 4, line 18 to page 5, line 9; fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH02182518 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-5 * , page 2, lower left column, line 4 to lower right column, line 8; page 4, upper left column, line 14 to upper right column, line 20; fig. 1 to 7 (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH0411511 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-5 * , page 2, lower right column, line 3 to page 3, upper left column, line 4; page 4, lower left column, line 9 to lower right column, line 10; fig. 1 to 6 (Family: none) * | Examination | JPS6137511 | US5133574 | US2012247888 | WO2015041298 | by applicant | JP2005199944 |