EP3446944 - COUPLING FOR A RAIL VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.2021 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.08.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Faiveley Transport Schwab AG Ebnatstrasse 150A 8207 Schaffhausen / CH | [2019/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fassbind, Mike Löwensteinstrasse 7 8212 Neuhausen / CH | [2020/28] |
Former [2019/09] | 01 /
FASSBIND, Mike Löwensteinstrasse 7 8212 Neuhausen / CH | Representative(s) | Luchs, Willi Luchs & Partner AG Patentanwälte Schulhausstrasse 12 8002 Zürich / CH | [2019/09] | Application number, filing date | 18184729.4 | 20.07.2018 | [2019/09] | Priority number, date | CH20170001048 | 23.08.2017 Original published format: CH 10482017 | [2019/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3446944 | Date: | 27.02.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3446944 | Date: | 08.07.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B61G7/12 | [2019/09] | CPC: |
B61G7/12 (EP);
B61G7/08 (CH);
B61G9/24 (CH)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/40] |
Former [2019/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KUPPELUNG FÜR EIN SCHIENENFAHRZEUG | [2019/09] | English: | COUPLING FOR A RAIL VEHICLE | [2019/09] | French: | ATTELAGE POUR UN VÉHICULE SUR RAILS | [2019/09] | Examination procedure | 26.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/40] | 26.08.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.07.2018 | AL | 08.07.2020 | CY | 08.07.2020 | CZ | 08.07.2020 | DK | 08.07.2020 | EE | 08.07.2020 | ES | 08.07.2020 | FI | 08.07.2020 | HR | 08.07.2020 | IT | 08.07.2020 | LT | 08.07.2020 | LV | 08.07.2020 | MC | 08.07.2020 | MK | 08.07.2020 | MT | 08.07.2020 | NL | 08.07.2020 | PL | 08.07.2020 | RO | 08.07.2020 | RS | 08.07.2020 | SI | 08.07.2020 | SK | 08.07.2020 | SM | 08.07.2020 | TR | 08.07.2020 | IE | 20.07.2020 | LU | 20.07.2020 | BE | 31.07.2020 | BG | 08.10.2020 | NO | 08.10.2020 | GR | 09.10.2020 | IS | 08.11.2020 | PT | 09.11.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 20.07.2018 | |
AL | 08.07.2020 | ||
CY | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
MT | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
TR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IE | 20.07.2020 | ||
LU | 20.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 20.07.2018 | |
AL | 08.07.2020 | ||
CY | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MT | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
TR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IE | 20.07.2020 | ||
LU | 20.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
IE | 20.07.2020 | ||
LU | 20.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
LU | 20.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
LU | 20.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
LU | 20.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | CZ | 08.07.2020 | |
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
LU | 20.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 08.07.2020 | |
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
LU | 20.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | DK | 08.07.2020 | |
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
LU | 20.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/17] | ES | 08.07.2020 | |
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | ES | 08.07.2020 | |
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | ES | 08.07.2020 | |
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 08.07.2020 | |
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 08.07.2020 | |
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB623103 (NAT MALLEABLE & STEEL CASTINGS) [A] 1-11 * page 2, line 63 - page 3, line 84; figures 1-8 *; | [A]DE1455239 (MIDLAND ROSS CORP) [A] 1-11 * page 7, line 17 - page 12, line 24; figures 1-5 *; | [A]CH702215 (SCHWAB VERKEHRSTECHNIK AG [CH]) [A] 1-11 * page 2, paragraph 0015 - page 3, paragraph 0034; figures 1-9 *; | [A]JP2013086652 (JAPAN STEEL WORKS LTD) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [A]US2014284297 (PECKHAM JASON DANIEL [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 3, paragraph 0031 - page 5, paragraph 0050; figures 1-12B * | by applicant | EP2322403 |