EP3509728 - AIR FILTER, METHOD FOR ITS MANUFACTURE AND ITS USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/29] | POROUS TEXTILE FABRIC, FILTER ELEMENT, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF AND USE THEREOF | ||
[2022/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.05.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sartorius Stedim Biotech GmbH August-Spindler-Strasse 11 37079 Göttingen / DE | [2022/48] |
Former [2019/29] | For all designated states Sartorius Stedim Biotech GmbH August-Spindler-Strasse 11 37079 Göttingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOEWE, Thomas Maria-Göppert-Weg 13 37077 Göttingen / DE | 02 /
FRIESE, Thomas Brückenstrasse 64 99752 Bleicherode / DE | 03 /
HANDT, Sebastian Heinrich-Sohnrey-Str. 36a 37127 Dransfeld / DE | 04 /
STRAUSS, Mario Barbiserstrasse 135 37431 Bad Lauterberg / DE | 05 /
NIKOLOUDIS, Paschalis Nussanger 21 37079 Göttingen / DE | [2022/47] |
Former [2019/29] | 01 /
LOEWE, Thomas Valentinsbreite 51 37077 Göttingen / DE | ||
02 /
FRIESE, Thomas Brückenstrasse 64 99752 Bleicherode / DE | |||
03 /
HANDT, Sebastian Mittelberg 17 37085 Göttingen / DE | |||
04 /
STRAUSS, Mario Barbiserstrasse 135 37431 Bad Lauterberg / DE | |||
05 /
NIKOLOUDIS, Paschalis Nussanger 21 37079 Göttingen / DE | Representative(s) | Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex, Geneva / CH | [2022/48] |
Former [2019/29] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17798098.4 | 30.10.2017 | [2019/29] | WO2017EP01267 | Priority number, date | DE20161013019 | 31.10.2016 Original published format: DE102016013019 | [2019/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018077476 | Date: | 03.05.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3509728 | Date: | 17.07.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3509728 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B01D65/00, B01D65/02, B01D69/10 | [2019/29] | CPC: |
B01D69/1071 (EP,US);
A61L9/16 (US);
B01D46/543 (US);
B01D65/003 (EP,US);
B01D65/022 (EP,US);
B01D69/02 (US);
B01D71/261 (EP,US);
B01D71/262 (EP,US);
B01D71/48 (EP,US);
A61L2209/14 (US);
A61L2209/22 (US);
B01D2271/025 (US);
B01D2279/65 (US);
B01D2325/28 (EP,US);
B01D2325/38 (EP,US);
B01D46/0028 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LUFTFILTER, VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG UND SEINE VERWENDUNG | [2022/19] | English: | AIR FILTER, METHOD FOR ITS MANUFACTURE AND ITS USE | [2022/19] | French: | FILTRE À AIR,MÉTHODE DE SA FABRICATION ET SON UTILISATION | [2022/19] |
Former [2019/29] | PORÖSES FLÄCHENGEBILDE, FILTERELEMENT, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | ||
Former [2019/29] | POROUS TEXTILE FABRIC, FILTER ELEMENT, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF AND USE THEREOF | ||
Former [2019/29] | STRUCTURE PLANE POREUSE, ÉLÉMENT FILTRANT, SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ET SON UTILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/29] | 11.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.04.2022 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 27.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 30.11.2022 | CZ | 30.11.2022 | DK | 30.11.2022 | EE | 30.11.2022 | ES | 30.11.2022 | FI | 30.11.2022 | HR | 30.11.2022 | IT | 30.11.2022 | LT | 30.11.2022 | LV | 30.11.2022 | MC | 30.11.2022 | NL | 30.11.2022 | PL | 30.11.2022 | RO | 30.11.2022 | RS | 30.11.2022 | SE | 30.11.2022 | SI | 30.11.2022 | SK | 30.11.2022 | SM | 30.11.2022 | NO | 28.02.2023 | GR | 01.03.2023 | IS | 30.03.2023 | PT | 31.03.2023 | [2024/28] |
Former [2024/26] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
IT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SI | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SI | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | CZ | 30.11.2022 | |
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | DK | 30.11.2022 | |
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | DK | 30.11.2022 | |
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | ES | 30.11.2022 | |
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | ES | 30.11.2022 | |
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | ES | 30.11.2022 | |
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | ES | 30.11.2022 | |
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 30.11.2022 | |
NO | 28.02.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XD]DE4234816 (SEITZ FILTER WERKE [DE]); | [X]WO9719743 (SARTORIUS GMBH [DE], et al); | [X]DE19729456 (SARTORIUS GMBH [DE]); | [A]WO0004984 (SEITZ FILTER WERKE [DE], et al); | [X]JP2002058974 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [X]JP2006289174 (NITTO DENKO CORP); | [A]WO2012031653 (SARTORIUS STEDIM BIOTECH GMBH [DE], et al) | by applicant | DE4234816 | DE102010056148 | DE102011121018 |