EP3543653 - NAVIGATION METHOD BASED ON ALONG-THE-WAY REFERENCE OBJECT MATCHING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIO (Anhui) Holding Co., Ltd. Susong Road West, Shenzhen Road North Economic and Technological Development Zone Hefei City, Anhui Province / CN | [2020/44] |
Former [2019/39] | For all designated states Nio Nextev Limited 30th Floor, Jardine House One Connaught Place Central, Hong Kong / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MA, Xiang Building 20, No. 56 AnTuo Road AnTing Town, Jiading District, Shanghai 201804 / CN | [2023/36] |
Former [2021/01] | 01 /
MA, Xiang Building 16, No. 56 Antuo Road Anting, Jiading, Shanghai / CN | ||
Former [2019/39] | 01 /
MA, Xiang Building 20 No. 56 AnTuo Road AnTing Town Jiading District Shanghai 201804 / CN | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2019/39] | Application number, filing date | 17870780.8 | 28.07.2017 | [2019/39] | WO2017CN95038 | Priority number, date | CN20161149020 | 21.11.2016 Original published format: CN201611049020 | [2019/39] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018090667 | Date: | 24.05.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3543653 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3543653 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/20, G01C21/36, B62D15/02, G01C21/12 | [2020/31] | CPC: |
G01C21/206 (EP);
G01C21/20 (CN,US);
G01C21/12 (EP);
G01C21/3685 (EP);
B60L53/30 (US);
B60Y2200/91 (US);
B60Y2300/91 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/39] | G01C21/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NAVIGATIONSVERFAHREN AUF BASIS DER ANPASSUNG VON REFERENZOBJEKTEN ENTLANG DES WEGES | [2019/39] | English: | NAVIGATION METHOD BASED ON ALONG-THE-WAY REFERENCE OBJECT MATCHING | [2019/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE NAVIGATION BASÉ SUR LA MISE EN CORRESPONDANCE DE L'OBJET DE RÉFÉRENCE EN COURS DE ROUTE | [2019/39] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2019 | Translation filed | 19.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2019 | Search fee paid | 19.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/39] | 26.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.09.2023 | CZ | 13.09.2023 | DK | 13.09.2023 | EE | 13.09.2023 | ES | 13.09.2023 | FI | 13.09.2023 | HR | 13.09.2023 | IT | 13.09.2023 | LT | 13.09.2023 | LV | 13.09.2023 | NL | 13.09.2023 | PL | 13.09.2023 | RO | 13.09.2023 | RS | 13.09.2023 | SE | 13.09.2023 | SK | 13.09.2023 | SM | 13.09.2023 | NO | 13.12.2023 | GR | 14.12.2023 | IS | 13.01.2024 | PT | 15.01.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
IT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 13.09.2023 | |
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN103440782 (SUN XIAOJUN, et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102013215960 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0009] , [0 11] , [0 12] , [0 36]; figure 5 *; | [XI]KR20160089580 (KYUNGPOOK NAT UNIV IND ACAD [KR]) [X] 1-5,8-10 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 9] , [0 11] , [0 16] - [0017] - [0 20] - [0021] - [0 39] , [0 44] , [0 46] , [0 49] , [0 53]; figures 1, 4, 6, 7 * [I] 6,7,11,12; | [A] - CHEN ZHENXIANG ET AL, "QR code location based reverse car-searching route recommendation model", 2014 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON VEHICULAR ELECTRONICS AND SAFETY, IEEE, (20141216), doi:10.1109/ICVES.2014.7063727, pages 73 - 77, XP032749134 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICVES.2014.7063727 | [A] - GROH BENJAMIN H ET AL, "Advanced real-time indoor parking localization based on semi-static objects", 17TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INFORMATION FUSION (FUSION), INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY OF INFORMATION FUSION, (20140707), pages 1 - 7, XP032654053 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | International search | [A]CN101784868 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD)[A] 1-12; | [A]CN104616520 (TENCENT TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD) [A] 1-12; | [A]CN104655125 (CHEN JINXUAN) [A] 1-12; | [A]CN105004340 (SHEN XIANGDONG) [A] 1-12; | [A]CN105424055 (SHENJIANG ELECTRIC VEHICLE CO) [A] 1-12; | [A]CN105928532 (UNIV CHINA PETROLEUM EAST CHINA) [A] 1-12 |