EP3560854 - TAMPER EVIDENT CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.05.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Multi Packaging Solutions UK Limited Millennium Way West Phoenix Centre Nottingham Nottinghamshire NG8 6AW / GB | [2019/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Davis, Nigel 22 Northern Drive Trowell Nottingham, Nottinghamshire NG9 3QL / GB | [2019/44] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2019/44] | Application number, filing date | 19171054.0 | 25.04.2019 | [2019/44] | Priority number, date | GB20180006942 | 27.04.2018 Original published format: GB 201806942 | GB20190002207 | 18.02.2019 Original published format: GB 201902207 | [2019/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3560854 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3560854 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/10, B65D5/02, B65D5/54 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
B65D5/0254 (EP);
B65D5/106 (EP,US);
B65D5/0227 (US);
B65D5/4266 (US);
B65D5/541 (EP);
B65D5/665 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/44] | B65D5/02, B65D5/54 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/23] |
Former [2019/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MANIPULATIONSSICHERER BEHÄLTER | [2019/44] | English: | TAMPER EVIDENT CONTAINER | [2019/44] | French: | RÉCIPIENT ANTI-SABOTAGE | [2019/44] | Examination procedure | 27.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/23] | 27.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.07.2023 | CZ | 19.07.2023 | DK | 19.07.2023 | EE | 19.07.2023 | ES | 19.07.2023 | FI | 19.07.2023 | HR | 19.07.2023 | IT | 19.07.2023 | LT | 19.07.2023 | LV | 19.07.2023 | PL | 19.07.2023 | RO | 19.07.2023 | RS | 19.07.2023 | SE | 19.07.2023 | SI | 19.07.2023 | SK | 19.07.2023 | SM | 19.07.2023 | NO | 19.10.2023 | GR | 20.10.2023 | IS | 19.11.2023 | PT | 20.11.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
CZ | 19.07.2023 | ||
DK | 19.07.2023 | ||
EE | 19.07.2023 | ||
ES | 19.07.2023 | ||
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
IT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RO | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
SK | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
CZ | 19.07.2023 | ||
DK | 19.07.2023 | ||
EE | 19.07.2023 | ||
ES | 19.07.2023 | ||
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RO | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
SK | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
CZ | 19.07.2023 | ||
DK | 19.07.2023 | ||
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RO | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 19.07.2023 | |
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE9306900U (HERMAN SCHÖTT GMBH OFFSETDRUCKEREI) [X] 1-3,9,10 * page 4, line 4 - page 5, line 30; figures 1-4 * [I] 4-8,11-15; | [A]US2005199692 (NELSON DANIEL J [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0082]; figures 1,8 *; | [XI]DE602004007700T (PACKART SAS [FR]) [X] 1,9,10 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0132]; figures 1-4 * [I] 2-8,11-15; | [XI]DE202010014299U (CD CARTONDRUCK AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,9,10 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0052]; figures 1-6 * [I] 4-8,11-15 |