EP3645335 - COIL DEVICE FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE, IN PARTICULAR FOR A CAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [2020/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HELM, Detlef Neuhütte 7 94151 Mauth / DE | 02 /
KRAMMER, Josef Almenrauschweg 6 B 83607 Holzkirchen / DE | 03 /
MÜLLER, Tobias Seidlwiese 5 94405 Landau / DE | [2020/19] | Application number, filing date | 18734809.9 | 28.06.2018 | [2020/19] | WO2018EP67353 | Priority number, date | DE201710211211 | 30.06.2017 Original published format: DE102017211211 | [2020/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019002433 | Date: | 03.01.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3645335 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3645335 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B60L53/12, B60L50/50, H01F3/00, H01F3/08, H01F38/14 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
B60L53/12 (EP,US);
H01F27/263 (US);
H01F3/08 (EP,US);
H01F38/14 (EP,US);
H02J50/10 (US);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/19] | B60L50/50, H01F3/00, H01F3/08, H01F38/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPULENEINRICHTUNG FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG, INSBESONDERE FÜR EINEN KRAFTWAGEN | [2020/19] | English: | COIL DEVICE FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE, IN PARTICULAR FOR A CAR | [2020/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF À BOBINE POUR UN VÉHICULE À MOTEUR, EN PARTICULIER POUR UN VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2020/19] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/19] | 17.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.06.2018 | AL | 27.04.2022 | CY | 27.04.2022 | CZ | 27.04.2022 | DK | 27.04.2022 | EE | 27.04.2022 | ES | 27.04.2022 | FI | 27.04.2022 | HR | 27.04.2022 | LT | 27.04.2022 | LV | 27.04.2022 | MC | 27.04.2022 | MK | 27.04.2022 | NL | 27.04.2022 | PL | 27.04.2022 | RO | 27.04.2022 | RS | 27.04.2022 | SE | 27.04.2022 | SI | 27.04.2022 | SK | 27.04.2022 | SM | 27.04.2022 | IE | 28.06.2022 | LU | 28.06.2022 | BE | 30.06.2022 | CH | 30.06.2022 | LI | 30.06.2022 | BG | 27.07.2022 | NO | 27.07.2022 | GR | 28.07.2022 | IS | 27.08.2022 | PT | 29.08.2022 | [2024/24] |
Former [2024/23] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
CY | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
MK | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
IE | 28.06.2022 | ||
LU | 28.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
CY | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
IE | 28.06.2022 | ||
LU | 28.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
IE | 28.06.2022 | ||
LU | 28.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
IE | 28.06.2022 | ||
LU | 28.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
IE | 28.06.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | CZ | 27.04.2022 | |
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | DK | 27.04.2022 | |
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | DK | 27.04.2022 | |
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | ES | 27.04.2022 | |
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | ES | 27.04.2022 | |
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | ES | 27.04.2022 | |
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | ES | 27.04.2022 | |
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | NL | 27.04.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE202012101402U (CONDUCTIX WAMPFLER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [AD]DE102015213096 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [AD] 1-10 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0029]; figures 2-6 *; | [A]DE102015218317 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0033]; figures 5-8 * | Examination | DE102012103315 | DE102016220898 | EP3419031 | by applicant | DE102013226830 | DE102015213096 |