EP3653797 - LOADED WEIGHT CORRECTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd. 16-1, HigashiUeno 2-chome Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0015 / JP | [2020/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOMITA, Kunitsugu c/o Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd. Tsuchiura Works 650 Kandatsu-machi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | 02 /
ISHII, Akinori c/o Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd. Tsuchiura Works 650 Kandatsu-machi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | [2020/21] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2020/21] | Application number, filing date | 18831529.5 | 20.06.2018 | [2020/21] | WO2018JP23503 | Priority number, date | JP20170137122 | 13.07.2017 Original published format: JP 2017137122 | [2020/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019012933 | Date: | 17.01.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3653797 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3653797 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E02F9/20, E02F9/26 | [2020/21] | CPC: |
E02F9/268 (EP);
E02F9/267 (KR);
G01G19/08 (EP,US);
E02F9/20 (KR);
E02F9/26 (US);
E02F9/264 (EP);
G01G23/01 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KORREKTURSYSTEM FÜR LADEGEWICHT | [2020/21] | English: | LOADED WEIGHT CORRECTION SYSTEM | [2020/21] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CORRECTION DE POIDS CHARGÉ | [2020/21] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2019 | Translation filed | 13.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2020 | Search fee paid | 13.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/21] | 30.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.03.2024 | 21.03.2024 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 22.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2017039514 (YTTERBIA INNOVATION AB [SE]) [A] 1-8* page 8, line 23 - page 10, line 10; figures 1-6 *; | [A]WO2017100455 (CATERPILLAR INC [US]) [A] 1-8 * page 3, line 8 - page 5, line 25; figure - * | International search | [A]JP3830151B [A] 1-8 * , *; | [A]JP2008240461 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * , *; | [A]JP2009235819 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * , *; | [A]WO2011090077 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * , & US 2012/0290178 A1 & EP 2527541 A1 & AU 2011208154 A *; | [A]JP5230851B [A] 1-8 * , & US 2014/0231153 A1 & CA 2807828 A1 *; | [A]US9464913 (BROWN JEREMY [US], et al) [A] 1-8* , & US 2016/0238403 A1 & CA 2976179 A1 * | by applicant | JPS5230851B |