EP3669127 - HEAT EXCHANGE ELEMENT AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/26] | HEAT-EXCHANGER ELEMENT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, BUILDING PANEL AND METHOD FOR DEHUMIDIFYING AIR | ||
[2024/13] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Buff, Ullrich Lange Wiese 11 07613 Crossen an der Elster / DE | [2020/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2020/26] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Europe LLP Neumarkter Straße 18 81673 München / DE | [2024/36] |
Former [2020/26] | HGF Europe LLP Neumarkter Str. 18 81673 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18759076.5 | 17.08.2018 | [2020/26] | WO2018EP72362 | Priority number, date | DE201710118977 | 18.08.2017 Original published format: DE102017118977 | DE201820102124U | 17.04.2018 Original published format: DE 202018102124 U | [2020/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2019034789 | Date: | 21.02.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3669127 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3669127 | Date: | 04.09.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F24F13/22, F24F5/00, F24D3/14, F28F3/00 | [2024/13] | CPC: |
F24F5/0089 (EP,US);
F24D3/142 (EP);
F24D3/148 (EP,US);
F24F13/222 (EP,US);
F24F5/0092 (EP);
F28F3/00 (EP,US);
Y02B30/00 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/26] | F24F13/22, F24F5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄRMETAUSCHERELEMENT UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2024/13] | English: | HEAT EXCHANGE ELEMENT AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THEREOF | [2024/13] | French: | ÉLÉMENT D'ÉCHANGE DE CHALEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DUDIT | [2024/13] |
Former [2020/26] | WÄRMETAUSCHERELEMENT UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG, GEBÄUDEPANEEL UND VERFAHREN ZUM ENTFEUCHTEN VON LUFT | ||
Former [2020/26] | HEAT-EXCHANGER ELEMENT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, BUILDING PANEL AND METHOD FOR DEHUMIDIFYING AIR | ||
Former [2020/26] | ÉLÉMENT ÉCHANGEUR DE CHALEUR ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION, PANNEAU DE CONSTRUCTION ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉSHUMIDIFICATION DE L'AIR | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/26] | 18.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]DE3941618 (GRAVIVENT RAUMLUFTTECHNIK GMBH [DE]); | [X]DE4216136 (KOESTER HELMUT [DE]); | [A]WO2007139370 (TAN WEE HUA [MY], et al); | [X]JP2009300051 (AOKI JUTAKU KIZAI HANBAI KK); | [XY]DE202008013961U (UPONOR INNOVATION AB [SE]); | [X]DE202010010564U (GIB GES FUER INNOVATIVE BAUTEC [DE]); | [Y]DE102010018162 (SCHMOELE GMBH [DE]); | [XY]DE102012014827 (SCHMÖLE GMBH [DE]); | [Y]EP3029387 (FEMTOFAB CO LTD [KR]); | [XY]EP3109559 (SCHMÖLE GMBH [DE]) | Examination | DE10214181 | DE102014014828 | by applicant | DE102005034141 |