EP3669526 - MANAGING SUBSCRIPTIONS FOR EVENT NOTIFICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2021/45] |
Former [2020/26] | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUIZ-MERAZ, Cesar Martin Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
VASTERS, Clemens Friedrich Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
STUCKI, David Leon Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 04 /
CAITUIRO MONGE, Hillary Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 05 /
MADAN, Hitesh Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 06 /
KALYANA SUNDARAM, Jayaraman Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 07 /
ARADHYULA BHAVANI, Padma Priya Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 08 /
RAVIPATI, Venkata Raja Gopal Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2020/26] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2020/26] | Application number, filing date | 18749626.0 | 27.06.2018 | [2020/26] | WO2018US39630 | Priority number, date | US201762545806P | 15.08.2017 Original published format: US 201762545806 P | US201815906926 | 27.02.2018 Original published format: US201815906926 | [2020/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019036118 | Date: | 21.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3669526 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3669526 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/18, G06F9/54, H04L45/302, H04L9/40, H04L67/10, H04L67/1008, H04L51/212, H04L51/214, H04L51/224, H04L67/55, H04L67/563, H04L67/568, H04L67/63 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
H04L67/1008 (EP,US);
H04L67/55 (EP,US);
G06F9/542 (EP,US);
H04L12/1859 (EP,US);
H04L45/306 (EP);
H04L51/212 (EP,US);
H04L51/214 (EP);
H04L51/224 (EP,US);
H04L63/0227 (EP);
H04L67/10 (EP,US);
H04L67/563 (EP);
H04L67/568 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/26] | H04L29/08, H04L12/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWALTUNG VON ABONNEMENTS FÜR EREIGNISBENACHRICHTIGUNGEN | [2023/31] | English: | MANAGING SUBSCRIPTIONS FOR EVENT NOTIFICATIONS | [2020/26] | French: | GESTION D'ABONNEMENTS POUR NOTIFICATIONS D'ÉVÉNEMENTS | [2023/34] |
Former [2020/26] | VERWALTUNG VON ABONNEMENTS FÜR EREIGNISMELDUNGEN | ||
Former [2020/26] | GESTION D'ABONNEMENTS À DES NOTIFICATIONS D'ÉVÉNEMENTS | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/26] | 14.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.10.2023 | 14.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 08.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.12.2023 | CZ | 20.12.2023 | EE | 20.12.2023 | ES | 20.12.2023 | FI | 20.12.2023 | HR | 20.12.2023 | IT | 20.12.2023 | LT | 20.12.2023 | LV | 20.12.2023 | NL | 20.12.2023 | PL | 20.12.2023 | RO | 20.12.2023 | RS | 20.12.2023 | SE | 20.12.2023 | SK | 20.12.2023 | SM | 20.12.2023 | BG | 20.03.2024 | NO | 20.03.2024 | GR | 21.03.2024 | IS | 20.04.2024 | PT | 22.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 20.12.2023 | |
CZ | 20.12.2023 | ||
EE | 20.12.2023 | ||
ES | 20.12.2023 | ||
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RO | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 20.12.2023 | |
ES | 20.12.2023 | ||
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | FI | 20.12.2023 | |
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 21.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1486897 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 1,6,10 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0027] ** figure 2 *; | [X]US2006155581 (EISENBERGER GEORGE [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,10,11 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0083] * * figures 2, 4 *; | [XI]US2013339448 (KAHAN EDUARDO T [US], et al) [X] 1,3,6,7,10,12 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0034] * * figure 2 * [I] 2,4,5,8,9,11,13-15 |