EP3682288 - OPTICAL COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Viewpoint Sicherheitsforschung - Blickforschung GmbH Am Heumarkt 10, Top 5 1030 Wien / AT | [2020/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLATT, Jan Mariahilferstraße 172/149 1150 Wien / AT | 02 /
KOZA, Martin Magdalenenstraße 23/19 1060 Wien / AT | 03 /
LINSENMAIER, Frank Schurwaldstraße 12 71384 Weinstadt / DE | [2020/30] | Representative(s) | Schardmüller Gall-Schuhmann Patentanwälte OG Garnisongasse 1/22a 1090 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2020/30] | Gibler & Poth Patentanwälte KG Dorotheergasse 7/14 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 18778395.6 | 14.09.2018 | [2020/30] | WO2018EP74902 | Priority number, date | AT20170050776 | 15.09.2017 Original published format: AT 507762017 | [2020/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019053198 | Date: | 21.03.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3682288 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3682288 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/01, G02B27/00, G02B3/00 | [2020/30] | CPC: |
G02B27/0093 (EP);
G02B9/00 (AT);
G02B27/0172 (EP);
G02B3/0068 (EP);
G02B2027/0187 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHES BAUTEIL | [2020/30] | English: | OPTICAL COMPONENT | [2020/30] | French: | COMPOSANT OPTIQUE | [2020/30] | Entry into regional phase | 15.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/30] | 15.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | MC | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | GB | 14.09.2023 | IE | 14.09.2023 | CH | 30.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/33] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
GB | 14.09.2023 | ||
IE | 14.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Cited in | International search | [I]JP2003202411 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD) [I] 11-15 * abstract *; | [I]US2005030647 (AMANAI TAKAHIRO [JP]) [I] 1,9,11 * paragraphs [0040] - [0087] - [0175] - paragraph [0182]; figures 1A,1B,43A,3B,26-28 *; | [XI]US2007221826 (BECHTEL JON H [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,11 * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0063]; figure 4 * [I] 3,5; | [I]US2010073534 (YANO YUJI [JP], et al) [I] 1,8,11,12 * paragraph [0294] - paragraph [0332]; figures 17,19,20-24 *; | [I]US2013194676 (SANNOKYOU TAKASHI [JP], et al) [I] 11-15* paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0040]; figures 1a,1b,2a-c,3 *; | [I]WO2013168811 (KONICA MINOLTA INC [JP]) [I] 11-15 * abstract * |