EP3712644 - LIGHT RECEIVING DEVICE, RANGE FINDING DEVICE AND LIGHT RECEIVING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0023 / JP | For all designated states Toshiba Electronic Devices & Storage Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-0023 / JP | [2020/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kubota, Hiroshi c/o Toshiba Electronic Devices & Storage Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0023 / JP | 02 /
Matsumoto, Nobu c/o Toshiba Electronic Devices & Storage Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0023 / JP | [2020/39] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/39] | Application number, filing date | 19195604.4 | 05.09.2019 | [2020/39] | Priority number, date | JP20190050991 | 19.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019050991 | [2020/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3712644 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3712644 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/481, G01S7/4863, G01S17/10, G01S17/42, G01S17/894 | [2020/39] | CPC: |
G01S7/4816 (EP);
G01S17/08 (CN);
G01S7/4863 (EP,CN,US);
G01S17/10 (EP,US);
G01S17/42 (EP);
G01S17/894 (EP);
G01S7/481 (CN);
G01S7/4817 (EP);
G01S7/4914 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/39] | Title | German: | LICHTEMPFANGSVORRICHTUNG, ENTFERNUNGSMESSVORRICHTUNG UND LICHTEMPFANGSVERFAHREN | [2020/39] | English: | LIGHT RECEIVING DEVICE, RANGE FINDING DEVICE AND LIGHT RECEIVING METHOD | [2020/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RÉCEPTION DE LUMIÈRE, DISPOSITIF DE RECHERCHE DE PORTÉE ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉCEPTION DE LUMIÈRE | [2020/39] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/39] | 22.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.08.2021 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 17.09.2021 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 28.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 20.03.2024 | FI | 20.03.2024 | HR | 20.03.2024 | LT | 20.03.2024 | LV | 20.03.2024 | NL | 20.03.2024 | SE | 20.03.2024 | NO | 20.06.2024 | RS | 20.06.2024 | GR | 21.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
LV | 20.03.2024 | ||
SE | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
LV | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 20.03.2024 | |
NO | 20.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2015285625 (DEANE PETER [US]); | [X]US2017150078 (UKAI YUKIHIRO [JP], et al) |