EP3714701 - COMPOSITION FOR TYPE IV ALLERGY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.03.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sone Farm Co., Ltd. 1-1-14 Shinjuku, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0022 / JP | [2020/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUGIYAMA, Masanori 2-2-46, Ushitahigashi, Higashi-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 732-0063 / JP | [2020/40] | Representative(s) | Papula Oy P.O. Box 981 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2020/40] | Application number, filing date | 19791557.2 | 04.04.2019 | [2020/40] | WO2019JP14998 | Priority number, date | JP20180084049 | 25.04.2018 Original published format: JP 2018084049 | [2020/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019208151 | Date: | 31.10.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3714701 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3714701 | Date: | 10.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/747, A61K31/715, A61P37/08, A23L33/135 | [2022/10] | CPC: |
A23L33/21 (EP);
A61K35/747 (EP,KR,US);
A23K10/10 (EP);
A23K10/16 (KR);
A23K20/163 (EP,KR);
A23K50/10 (EP);
A23K50/40 (EP);
A23K50/75 (EP);
A23K50/80 (EP);
A23L33/125 (KR);
A23L33/135 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/715 (EP,KR);
A61K31/726 (EP,KR);
A61K31/736 (EP,KR);
A61K36/60 (EP,KR);
A61K8/73 (KR);
A61K8/9728 (KR);
A61K8/99 (KR,US);
A61P17/04 (EP,KR);
A61P37/08 (EP,KR);
A61Q19/00 (KR);
C07H3/06 (US);
A23L2/52 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (KR);
A23V2200/304 (KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/726, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K35/747, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K36/60, A61K2300/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/09] | A23L2/52 | ||
Former IPC [2020/40] | A23L33/135, A23K10/10, A23K20/163, A23L2/38, A23L2/52, A23L33/125, A61K8/9728, A61K31/715, A61K31/726, A61K31/736, A61K35/747, A61P17/04, A61P37/08, A61Q19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR TYP-IV-ALLERGIE | [2020/40] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR TYPE IV ALLERGY | [2020/40] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR ALLERGIE DE TYPE IV | [2020/40] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2020 | Translation filed | 22.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 22.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/40] | 31.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.06.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 10.08.2022 | AT | 10.08.2022 | CZ | 10.08.2022 | DK | 10.08.2022 | EE | 10.08.2022 | ES | 10.08.2022 | FI | 10.08.2022 | HR | 10.08.2022 | IT | 10.08.2022 | LT | 10.08.2022 | LV | 10.08.2022 | MC | 10.08.2022 | NL | 10.08.2022 | PL | 10.08.2022 | RO | 10.08.2022 | RS | 10.08.2022 | SE | 10.08.2022 | SI | 10.08.2022 | SK | 10.08.2022 | SM | 10.08.2022 | NO | 10.11.2022 | GR | 11.11.2022 | IS | 10.12.2022 | PT | 12.12.2022 | IE | 04.04.2023 | LU | 04.04.2023 | BE | 30.04.2023 | CH | 30.04.2023 | LI | 30.04.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/21] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
MC | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
IE | 04.04.2023 | ||
LU | 04.04.2023 | ||
BE | 30.04.2023 | ||
CH | 30.04.2023 | ||
LI | 30.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/12] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
MC | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
LU | 04.04.2023 | ||
BE | 30.04.2023 | ||
CH | 30.04.2023 | ||
LI | 30.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
MC | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
LU | 04.04.2023 | ||
CH | 30.04.2023 | ||
LI | 30.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
MC | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
LU | 04.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/04] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
LU | 04.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 10.08.2022 | |
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 10.08.2022 | |
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 10.08.2022 | |
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 10.08.2022 | |
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 10.08.2022 | |
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | FI | 10.08.2022 | |
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 10.08.2022 | |
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 10.08.2022 | |
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 10.08.2022 | |
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]KR20160008060 ; | [X]JP2010138147 (OP BIO FACTORY CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5,8-12 * abstract *; | [X]WO2012133827 (MORINAGA MILK INDUSTRY CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,8-12 * abstract *; | [XP]WO2018225556 (ASAHI KOHSAN CORP [JP]) [XP] 1-4,6-12 * paragraphs [0044] - [50114]; example 8; claims 1-12,14 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2016, no. 18, Database accession no. 2016-066872, XP002801541 & KR20160008060 A 20160121 (KOREA FOOD RES INST) [X] 1-3,8-12 * abstract * | [A] - J. BENYACOUB ET AL, "Immune modulation property of Lactobacillus paracasei NCC2461 (ST11) strain and impact on skin defences", BENEFICIAL MICROBES, NL, (2014), vol. 5, no. 2, doi:10.3920/BM2013.0014, ISSN 1876-2883, pages 129 - 136, XP055338869 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3920/BM2013.0014 | International search | [XYA]JP2005137357 (KIRIN BREWERY) [X] 1-3, 5, 8-12 * , * [Y] 6-7 [A] 4; | [XYA]JP2011142907 (LYTONE ENTPR INC) [X] 1-3, 5, 8-12 * , 2 1, 4 & US 2011/0150838 A1, claims 1, 21, examples 3, 4 & US 2013/0063075 A1 & WO 2011/076007 A1 & WO 2013/181478 A2 & EP 2338977 A1 & KR 10-2011-0073380 A & CN 102168043 A * [Y] 6-7 [A] 4; | [YA]JP2017014231 (MEIJI CO LTD) [Y] 6-7 * , * [A] 1-5,8-12; | [YA] - MAKINO S et al, "Development of Functional Yogurt Utilizing Lactobacillus for Producing Immunmodulation Polysaccharides (non-official translation)", Kagaku to Seibutsu, (01-01-2015), vol. 53, no. 10, pages 709 - 714 [Y] 6-7 [A] 1-5,8-12 | [A] - VIDAL KARINE et al., "Effect of Lactobacillus paracasei NCC2461 on Antigen-Specific T- Cell Mediated Immune Responses in Aged Mice", REJUVENATION RESEARCH, (20080000), vol. 11, no. 5, doi:10.1089/rej.2008.0780, ISSN 1549-1684, pages 957 - 964, XP055647021 [A] 1-12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/rej.2008.0780 | [A] - KOU XIAOHONG et al., "A tolerant lactic acid bacteria, Lactobacillus paracasei, and its immunoregulatory function", Can. J. Microbiol, (20140000), vol. 60, no. 11, doi:10.1139/cjm-2014-0383, pages 729 - 736, XP009521230 [A] 1-12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1139/cjm-2014-0383 | [PA] - NODA MASAFUMI et al., "A novel structure of exopolysaccharide produced by a plant-derived lactic acid bacterium Lactobacillus paracasei IJH-SONE68", J. Biochem, (20180500), vol. 164, no. 2, doi:10.1093/jb/mvy048, pages 87 - 92, XP055561348 [PA] 1-12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/jb/mvy048 | [PX] - NODA Masafumi et al, "Functionality Analysis of Inflammation from and Allergies to extracellular Polysaccharid Lactobacillus paracasei IJH-SONE68", Japanese journal of lactic Acid Bacteria, (20180702), vol. 29, no. 2, page 117 [PX] 1-12 | by applicant | JPH03172171 | JPH092959 | JP2835548B | JP2000095697 | JP2006067881 | JP2006104107 | WO2011046194 | - International archives of allergy and immunology, (20040000), vol. 135, pages 205 - 215 | - "16S/23S rRNA sequencing", LANE, DJ, Nucleic Acid Techniques in Bacterial Systematics, Wiley, (19910000), pages 115 - 175 | - KIMMEL SAROBERTS RF., "Development of a growth medium suitable for exopolysaccharide production by Lactobacillus delbrueckii ssp. Bulgaricus RR", Int. J. Food Microbiol., (19980000), vol. 40, pages 87 - 92 | - KETS EPWGALINSKI EADE BONT JAM. CARNITINE, "A novel compatible solute in Lactobacillus plantarum", Arch. Microbiol., (19940000), vol. 192, pages 243 - 248 | - DUBOIS MGILLES KAHAMILTON JKREBERS PASMITH F., "Colorimetric method for determination of sugars and related substances", Anal. Chem., (19560000), vol. 28, doi:10.1021/ac60111a017, pages 350 - 356, XP000918426 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac60111a017 |