EP3715682 - VALVE FOR AN AIR COOLING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.12.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mirai Intex Sagl Via Luigi Pasteur 1 6830 Chiasso / CH | [2020/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsyplakov, Vladyslav Chemin des Graviers 19 1290 Versoix / CH | [2020/40] | Representative(s) | Musil, Dobroslav Dobroslav Musil a partneri s.r.o. Zabrdovicka 11 615 00 Brno / CZ | [N/P] |
Former [2020/40] | Musil, Dobroslav Zàbrdovicka 11 615 00 Brno / CZ | Application number, filing date | 20166418.2 | 27.03.2020 | [2020/40] | Priority number, date | CZ20190000189 | 28.03.2019 Original published format: CZ 20190189 | [2020/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3715682 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3715682 | Date: | 17.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F16K11/052, F16K11/16, F24F13/14, F16K31/52 | [2020/40] | CPC: |
F16K11/052 (EP);
F16K1/32 (CZ);
F16K11/165 (EP);
F16K31/521 (EP);
F24F13/10 (CZ);
F24F13/14 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] |
Former [2020/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VENTIL FÜR EINE LUFTKÜHLMASCHINE | [2020/40] | English: | VALVE FOR AN AIR COOLING MACHINE | [2020/40] | French: | SOUPAPE POUR UNE MACHINE DE REFROIDISSEMENT D'AIR | [2020/40] | Examination procedure | 23.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/17] | 23.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 05.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.05.2023 | CZ | 17.05.2023 | DK | 17.05.2023 | EE | 17.05.2023 | ES | 17.05.2023 | FI | 17.05.2023 | HR | 17.05.2023 | IT | 17.05.2023 | LT | 17.05.2023 | LV | 17.05.2023 | NL | 17.05.2023 | PL | 17.05.2023 | RO | 17.05.2023 | RS | 17.05.2023 | SE | 17.05.2023 | SI | 17.05.2023 | SK | 17.05.2023 | SM | 17.05.2023 | NO | 17.08.2023 | GR | 18.08.2023 | IS | 17.09.2023 | PT | 18.09.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
CZ | 17.05.2023 | ||
DK | 17.05.2023 | ||
EE | 17.05.2023 | ||
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
FI | 17.05.2023 | ||
HR | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RO | 17.05.2023 | ||
RS | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
SI | 17.05.2023 | ||
SK | 17.05.2023 | ||
SM | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
CZ | 17.05.2023 | ||
DK | 17.05.2023 | ||
EE | 17.05.2023 | ||
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
FI | 17.05.2023 | ||
HR | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RO | 17.05.2023 | ||
RS | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
SK | 17.05.2023 | ||
SM | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
FI | 17.05.2023 | ||
HR | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RS | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
SK | 17.05.2023 | ||
SM | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
FI | 17.05.2023 | ||
HR | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RS | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
HR | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RS | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
HR | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RS | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
ES | 17.05.2023 | ||
NL | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 17.05.2023 | |
PT | 18.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US1937597 (SCHMIDT CARL A) [X] 1-4,6 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS5079234U (-) [A] 1* abstract *; | [X]US2014248832 (HANUS JOHN P [US]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X]FR3053103 (VENTILAIRSEC [FR]) [X] 1-4,6 * page 1, line 5 - page 11, line 20; figure - * | by applicant | SU241059 | RU2067263 | RU2410591 | RU2413110 |