EP3956480 - A METHOD AND A PACKAGING FOR PACKING ONE OR MORE ANIMAL HIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ecco Sko A/S Industrivej 5 6261 Bredebro / DK | [2023/23] |
Former [2022/08] | For all designated states Ecco Sko A/S Industrivej 5 6261 Bredebro / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREGOR, Thomas c/o ECCO SKO A/S Industrivej 5 6261 Bredebro / DK | 02 /
RADTKE, Andre c/o ECCO SKO A/S Industrivej 5 6261 Bredebro / DK | 03 /
MEYER, Verena c/o ECCO SKO A/S Industrivej 5 6261 Bredebro / DK | [2022/08] | Representative(s) | Patentgruppen A/S Aaboulevarden 31, 4th Floor 8000 Aarhus C / DK | [2023/23] |
Former [2022/08] | Dragsted Partners A/S Rådhuspladsen 16 1550 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 20718333.6 | 17.04.2020 | [2022/08] | WO2020EP60860 | Priority number, date | EP20190169802 | 17.04.2019 Original published format: EP 19169802 | [2022/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020212570 | Date: | 22.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3956480 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3956480 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C14B1/00, C14C1/00, C14C9/00 | [2022/08] | CPC: |
C14B1/00 (EP);
B65D81/24 (CN);
B65B31/04 (US);
B65B5/045 (US);
B65D81/20 (CN);
B65D81/2023 (US);
B65D81/2046 (CN);
B65D81/2069 (CN);
B65D81/28 (CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VERPACKUNG ZUM VERPACKEN EINER ODER MEHRERER TIERHÄUTE | [2022/08] | English: | A METHOD AND A PACKAGING FOR PACKING ONE OR MORE ANIMAL HIDES | [2022/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET EMBALLAGE POUR EMBALLER UNE OU PLUSIEURS PEAUX D'ANIMAUX | [2022/08] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/08] | 15.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/10] |
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Cited in | International search | [YA]US4985039 (ENDLWEBER HANS [AT]); | [A]US5096553 (ROSS GRAEME D [CA], et al); | [XAYI]RU2019568 (MO I PRIKLADNOJ BIOTEKHNOLOGII [RU]); | [A]WO2014167359 (XEROS LTD [GB]) |