EP3958796 - GLENOID IMPLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Encore Medical, L.P. (D/B/A DJO Surgical) 9800 Metric Boulevard Austin, TX 78758 / US | [2022/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AXELSON, Stuart, L. 12 Churchill Drive Succasunna, New Jersey 07876 / US | 02 /
HAMANN, Catherine, Ann 41 Alta Mira Dr. Chester, New York 10918 / US | 03 /
ACKLEY, Katherine, Victoria 6435 Walters Woods Dr. Falls Church, Virginia 22044 / US | 04 /
TRIBBLE, Grant, Lieder 13604 Overhill Dr. Hagerstown, Maryland 21742 / US | 05 /
SRIRAM, Shreyas 3430 233rd Place SE Sammamish, Washington 98075 / US | [2022/09] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2022/09] | Application number, filing date | 20794902.5 | 24.04.2020 | [2022/09] | WO2020US29947 | Priority number, date | US201962838633P | 25.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962838633 P | [2022/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020219973 | Date: | 29.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3958796 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3958796 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/40, A61F2/30 | [2022/09] | CPC: |
A61F2/4081 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2/30749 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2002/30327 (US);
A61F2002/30405 (US);
A61F2002/30537 (EP,KR);
A61F2002/30545 (EP,KR);
A61F2002/30579 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2002/30878 (EP,KR);
A61F2002/30901 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2002/4085 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GLENOIDIMPLANTAT | [2022/09] | English: | GLENOID IMPLANT | [2022/09] | French: | IMPLANT GLÉNOÏDIEN | [2022/09] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 18.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/09] | 13.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24153933.7 / EP4335414 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.02.2024 | BG | 14.02.2024 | ES | 14.02.2024 | FI | 14.02.2024 | HR | 14.02.2024 | LT | 14.02.2024 | LV | 14.02.2024 | NL | 14.02.2024 | PL | 14.02.2024 | SE | 14.02.2024 | NO | 14.05.2024 | RS | 14.05.2024 | GR | 15.05.2024 | IS | 14.06.2024 | PT | 14.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 14.02.2024 | |
BG | 14.02.2024 | ||
ES | 14.02.2024 | ||
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
LV | 14.02.2024 | ||
NL | 14.02.2024 | ||
PL | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
PT | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 14.02.2024 | |
BG | 14.02.2024 | ||
ES | 14.02.2024 | ||
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
NL | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 14.02.2024 | |
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
NL | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 14.02.2024 | |
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 14.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2843293 (CAPON DIDIER [FR]); | [A]US6905512 (PAES NEWTON [BR], et al); | [A]US2006200249 (BEGUIN LAURENT [FR], et al); | [A]WO2016025378 (BIOMET MFG LLC [US]) | International search | [A]US5702447 (WALCH GILLES [FR], et al); | [A]US2007150065 (ANGIBAUD LAURENT [US]); | [A]US2007219637 (BERELSMAN BRIAN K [US], et al); | [A]US2010274359 (BRUNNARIUS YANN [FR], et al); | [A]US2013150972 (IANNOTTI JOSEPH P [US], et al); | [A]US2013261752 (LAPPIN KYLE E [US], et al); | [A]US2015305877 (GARGAC SHAWN M [US], et al) | by applicant | US5702447 |