EP4025144 - ELECTROPORATION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/28] | AN ELECTROPORATION APPARATUS AND METHOD | ||
[2023/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mirai Medical Limited Unit 5 Howley Court Oranmore H91 FK6C County Galway / IE | [2022/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SODEN, Declan Dunowen, Ardfield Clonakilty, County Cork, P85 P797 / IE | 02 /
FORDE, Colin Ballyclery, Kinvara County Galway, H91 HFX2 / IE | 03 /
KINSELLA, Sean 95 Costa na Mara, Oranmore County Galway, H91 F8X5 / IE | 04 /
MOORE, Tony c/o TMC Technology Ltd. Unit 1b, Enterprise Park Inishmore, Ballincollig County Cork / IE | [2022/28] | Representative(s) | Weldon O'Brien Ltd. Shannon Lodge Casement Road Bandon County Cork, P72 TN24 / IE | [2022/28] | Application number, filing date | 20767504.2 | 01.09.2020 | [2022/28] | WO2020EP74374 | Priority number, date | EP20190194958 | 02.09.2019 Original published format: EP 19194958 | EP20190194959 | 02.09.2019 Original published format: EP 19194959 | EP20200168567 | 07.04.2020 Original published format: EP 20168567 | [2022/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021043779 | Date: | 11.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4025144 | Date: | 13.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4025144 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/12, A61N1/32, A61B18/14, C12M1/42, // A61B18/00 | [2023/15] | CPC: |
A61N1/327 (EP,US);
C12M35/02 (EP,US);
A61B18/1206 (EP);
A61B18/1477 (EP);
A61B2018/00113 (EP);
A61B2018/0016 (EP);
A61B2018/00613 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00767 (EP);
A61B2018/00875 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/28] | A61B18/12, A61N1/32, C12M1/42, A61B18/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROPORATIONSGERÄT | [2023/15] | English: | ELECTROPORATION APPARATUS | [2023/15] | French: | APPAREIL D'ÉLECTROPORATION | [2023/15] |
Former [2022/28] | ELEKTROPORATIONSGERÄT UND -VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2022/28] | AN ELECTROPORATION APPARATUS AND METHOD | ||
Former [2022/28] | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ D'ÉLECTROPORATION | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/28] | 03.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23185028.0 / EP4230718 | EP24190953.0 | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 06.09.2023 | ES | 06.09.2023 | HR | 06.09.2023 | PL | 06.09.2023 | RO | 06.09.2023 | RS | 06.09.2023 | SK | 06.09.2023 | SM | 06.09.2023 | NO | 06.12.2023 | GR | 07.12.2023 | IS | 06.01.2024 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 06.09.2023 | |
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 06.09.2023 | |
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/11] | HR | 06.09.2023 | |
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 06.12.2023 | |
GR | 07.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [YA]US5702359 (HOFMANN GUNTER A [US], et al); | [YA]US6096020 (HOFMANN GUENTER A [US]); | [XI]WO2005048977 (BTG INT LTD [GB], et al); | [AD]US2006089674 (WALTERS RICHARD E [US], et al); | [XI]US2008312579 (CHANG KUOWEI [US], et al); | [XI]US2014188071 (JACOFSKY MARC C [US], et al); | [A]US2017348525 (SANO MICHAEL [US], et al); | [AD]WO2018200800 (FARAPULSE INC [US]) | by applicant | US2006089674 | WO2018200800 |