EP4033773 - CONNECTION METHOD FOR MULTIMEDIA PLAYING DEVICE, MULTIMEDIA PLAYING DEVICE AND CONTROL TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.08.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2022/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, Shangbo Guangdong, 523860 / CN | [2022/30] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/30] | Application number, filing date | 22162582.5 | 30.11.2015 | [2022/30] | Priority number, date | CN201510514729 | 20.08.2015 Original published format: CN201510514729 | [2022/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4033773 | Date: | 27.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4033773 | Date: | 15.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/436, H04N21/41, H04W4/00, H04N7/00, H04N21/43, H04N21/4363, H04N21/442, H04W4/80, H04W76/14, // H04N5/76, H04W84/18, H04W88/04 | [2022/30] | CPC: |
H04N21/41265 (EP,US);
H04W76/10 (US);
H04N21/43 (EP,US);
H04N21/43615 (EP);
H04N21/43637 (EP);
H04N21/44227 (EP);
H04N7/00 (EP,US);
H04W4/00 (EP,US);
H04W4/80 (EP,US);
H04W76/14 (EP,US);
H04N5/76 (EP,US);
H04W84/18 (EP,US);
H04W88/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/39] |
Former [2022/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR MULTIMEDIA-ABSPIELGERÄT, MULTIMEDIA-ABSPIELGERÄT UND STEUERTERMINAL | [2022/30] | English: | CONNECTION METHOD FOR MULTIMEDIA PLAYING DEVICE, MULTIMEDIA PLAYING DEVICE AND CONTROL TERMINAL | [2022/30] | French: | PROCEDE DE CONNEXION POUR DISPOSITIF DE LECTURE MULTIMEDIA, DISPOSITIF DE LECTURE MULTIMEDIA ET TERMINAL DE COMMANDE | [2022/49] |
Former [2022/30] | PROCÉDÉ DE CONNEXION POUR DISPOSITIF DE LECTURE MULTIMEDIA, DISPOSITIF DE LECTURE MULTIMEDIA ET TERMINAL DE COMMANDE | Examination procedure | 19.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/39] | 19.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15893541.1 / EP3169086 | Opposition(s) | 16.11.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.02.2023 | CZ | 15.02.2023 | DK | 15.02.2023 | EE | 15.02.2023 | ES | 15.02.2023 | FI | 15.02.2023 | HR | 15.02.2023 | IT | 15.02.2023 | LT | 15.02.2023 | LV | 15.02.2023 | MC | 15.02.2023 | NL | 15.02.2023 | PL | 15.02.2023 | RO | 15.02.2023 | RS | 15.02.2023 | SE | 15.02.2023 | SI | 15.02.2023 | SK | 15.02.2023 | SM | 15.02.2023 | NO | 15.05.2023 | GR | 16.05.2023 | IS | 15.06.2023 | PT | 15.06.2023 | [2024/32] |
Former [2024/27] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
CZ | 15.02.2023 | ||
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
IT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RO | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
SI | 15.02.2023 | ||
SK | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
CZ | 15.02.2023 | ||
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RO | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
SI | 15.02.2023 | ||
SK | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
CZ | 15.02.2023 | ||
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RO | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
SK | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
CZ | 15.02.2023 | ||
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RO | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 15.02.2023 | |
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 15.02.2023 | |
LT | 15.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010260348 (BHOW GUNJAN D [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * figures 1,2,6,9,11 * * paragraphs [0017] - [0061] * * paragraphs [0065] - [0069] *; | [A]US2010284389 (RAMSAY MAX [AU], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * figures 1, 2C, 3A, 3B, 4B * * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0006] - [0022] * * paragraphs [0054] - [0160] * * paragraphs [0174] - [0179] *; | [A]US2012099594 (LAU DANNIE [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * figures 1,2,4-6b,8-10 * * paragraphs [0004] , [0024] - [0042] * * paragraphs [0061] - [0083] * * paragraphs [0096] - [0114] *; | [A]EP2750353 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [0042] - [0064] * * paragraphs [0068] - [0098] ** paragraphs [0108] , [0119] , [0120] , [0126] * |