EP4050634 - SWITCHING DEVICE FOR ELECTRIC POWER DISTRIBUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2022/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAVIKAR, Kapil 403602 Margoa / IN | 02 /
CHIKHALE, Ravindra 403602 Goa / IN | 03 /
INAMDAR, Sharvari 400708 Navi Mumbai / IN | 04 /
SHINDE, Deepak 422101 Nashik, Maharashtra / IN | 05 /
SONAWANE, Mahesh 410210 Navimumbai, Maharashtra / IN | 06 /
TIVARE, Pradip 403602 Margao, Goa / IN | [2022/35] | Representative(s) | Patentanwaltskanzlei WILHELM & BECK Prinzenstraße 13 80639 München / DE | [2022/35] | Application number, filing date | 21159336.3 | 25.02.2021 | [2022/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4050634 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4050634 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01H33/56, H01H33/12, // H01H31/00, H01H33/14, H01H33/666, H01H33/662, H02B13/035, H02B13/045 | [2022/35] | CPC: |
H01H33/56 (EP);
H01H33/122 (EP);
H01H2033/566 (EP);
H01H2033/6623 (EP);
H01H31/003 (EP);
H01H33/143 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/13] |
Former [2022/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SCHALTVORRICHTUNG ZUR STROMVERTEILUNG | [2022/35] | English: | SWITCHING DEVICE FOR ELECTRIC POWER DISTRIBUTION | [2022/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMUTATION POUR LA DISTRIBUTION D'ÉNERGIE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2022/35] | Examination procedure | 17.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/13] | 17.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.11.2023 | CZ | 15.11.2023 | DK | 15.11.2023 | EE | 15.11.2023 | ES | 15.11.2023 | HR | 15.11.2023 | IT | 15.11.2023 | LT | 15.11.2023 | LV | 15.11.2023 | NL | 15.11.2023 | PL | 15.11.2023 | RO | 15.11.2023 | RS | 15.11.2023 | SE | 15.11.2023 | SK | 15.11.2023 | SM | 15.11.2023 | BG | 15.02.2024 | NO | 15.02.2024 | GR | 16.02.2024 | IS | 15.03.2024 | PT | 15.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
CZ | 15.11.2023 | ||
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
EE | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RO | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 15.11.2023 | |
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 16.02.2024 | |
IS | 15.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2004032169 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 4, paragraph 5 - page 6, paragraph 1; figure 1 *; | [A]US2005056617 (ROKUNOHE TOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 4, paragraph 0043 - page 5, paragraph 0056; figures 6-9 *; | [A]JP2015089202 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-15* page 5, paragraph 0017 - page 7, paragraph 0028; figures 1,2 * |