EP4057826 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING PROTEIN MASS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsches Institut für Lebensmitteltechnik e.V. Prof.-von-Klitzing-Strasse 7 49610 Quakenbrück / DE | [2022/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARNIAKOV, Oleksii Prof.-von-Klitzing-Strasse 7 49610 Quakenbrück / DE | [2022/38] | Representative(s) | Taruttis, Stefan Georg TARUTTIS Patentanwaltskanzlei Aegidientorplatz 2b 30159 Hannover / DE | [2022/38] | Application number, filing date | 20841680.0 | 17.12.2020 | [2022/38] | WO2020EP86905 | Priority number, date | DE201910219928 | 17.12.2019 Original published format: DE102019219928 | [2022/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021123077 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4057826 | Date: | 21.09.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4057826 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A23J1/00, A23K10/20 | [2022/38] | CPC: |
A23J1/002 (EP);
A23K10/20 (EP,US);
A23J1/00 (US);
A23L33/17 (US);
A23V2002/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PROTEINMASSE | [2022/38] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING PROTEIN MASS | [2022/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE MASSE PROTÉINIQUE | [2022/38] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/38] | 17.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE102012201822 (DEUTSCHES INST LEBENSMITTELTEC [DE]); | [A]WO2017066880 (C-FU FOODS INC [CA]); | [AP]WO2020011903 (GEA MECHANICAL EQUIPMENT GMBH [DE]) | Examination | EP3662760 | DE102020002938 | by applicant | DE102017210327 |