EP4057841 - USE OF ALPHA-LACTALBUMIN ENRICHED WHEY PROTEIN EXTRACT AS A SOURCE OF CHOLESTEROL AND SYNTHETIC NUTRITIONAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING AN ALPHA-LACTALBUMIN ENRICHED WHEY PROTEIN EXTRACT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/38] | USE OF ?-LACTALBUMIN ENRICHED WHEY PROTEIN EXTRACT AS A SOURCE OF CHOLESTEROL | ||
[2024/07] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.06.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.06.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [2024/18] |
Former [2022/38] | For all designated states Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O'REGAN, Jonathan The Laurels, Knockeendubh Killarney, Co.Kerry V93E1T2 / IE | 02 /
MOLONEY, Cian Terence 26, Lower Pouladuff Road Cork City, Cork T12 XA4T / IE | 03 /
O'CONNOR, Deborah 7 Farranvilla Farranshone Limerick V94 EE0K / IE | [2022/38] | Representative(s) | Gagliardi, Tatiana, et al Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [2024/36] |
Former [2022/38] | Gagliardi, Tatiana Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | Application number, filing date | 20800682.5 | 09.11.2020 | [2022/38] | WO2020EP81445 | Priority number, date | EP20190208776 | 13.11.2019 Original published format: EP 19208776 | [2022/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021094241 | Date: | 20.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4057841 | Date: | 21.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4057841 | Date: | 04.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A23C21/00, A23L33/19, A23L33/00, A23J1/20 | [2024/07] | CPC: |
A23L33/19 (EP,US);
A23C21/00 (EP);
A23J1/205 (EP);
A23J3/08 (US);
A23L33/40 (EP,US);
A61K38/38 (US);
A23V2002/00 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/38] | A23L33/19, A23L33/00, A23J1/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON MIT ALPHA-LACTALBUMIN ANGEREICHERTEM MOLKENPROTEINEXTRAKT ALS EINE QUELLE VON CHOLESTERIN UND SYNTHETISCHE ERNÄHRUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG ENTHALTEND EINES MIT ALPHA-LACTALBUMIN ANGEREICHERTEM MOLKENPROTEINEXTRAKTS | [2024/07] | English: | USE OF ALPHA-LACTALBUMIN ENRICHED WHEY PROTEIN EXTRACT AS A SOURCE OF CHOLESTEROL AND SYNTHETIC NUTRITIONAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING AN ALPHA-LACTALBUMIN ENRICHED WHEY PROTEIN EXTRACT | [2024/07] | French: | UTILISATION D'EXTRAIT DE PROTÉINE DE LACTOSÉRUM ENRICHI EN ALPHA-LACTALBUMINE EN TANT QUE SOURCE DE CHOLESTÉROL ET COMPOSITION NUTRITIONNELLE SYNTHÉTIQUE COMPRENANT UN EXTRAIT DE PROTÉINE DE LACTOSÉRUM ENRICHI EN ALPHA-LACTALBUMINE | [2024/07] |
Former [2022/38] | VERWENDUNG VON MIT LACTALBUMIN ANGEREICHERTEM MOLKENPROTEINEXTRAKT ALS EINE QUELLE VON CHOLESTERIN | ||
Former [2022/38] | USE OF ?-LACTALBUMIN ENRICHED WHEY PROTEIN EXTRACT AS A SOURCE OF CHOLESTEROL | ||
Former [2022/38] | UTILISATION D'EXTRAIT DE PROTÉINE DE LACTOSÉRUM ENRICHI EN ?-LACTALBUMINE EN TANT QUE SOURCE DE CHOLESTÉROL | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/38] | 13.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 27.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | 27.03.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 27.03.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.03.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4782138 (RIALLAND JEAN-PAUL [FR], et al); | [XD]US6312755 (WU CHAO [US]); | [X]WO2019122363 (NESTLE SA [CH]); | by applicant | US6312755 |