EP4239944 - METHOD FOR CRYPTOGRAPHIC SIGNING OF A DATA ITEM, ASSOCIATED ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND COMPUTER PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IDEMIA France 2, place Samuel de Champlain 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2023/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOTTAX, Emmanuelle 92400 COURBEVOIE / FR | 02 /
HOUZELOT, Agathe 92400 COURBEVOIE / FR | 03 /
GIRAUD, Christophe 92400 COURBEVOIE / FR | [2023/36] | Representative(s) | Idemia 2, place Samuel de Champlain 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2023/36] | Application number, filing date | 23150780.7 | 09.01.2023 | [2023/36] | Priority number, date | FR20220001866 | 03.03.2022 Original published format: FR 2201866 | [2023/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4239944 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4239944 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/00, H04L9/32 | [2023/36] | CPC: |
H04L9/004 (EP);
H04L9/3247 (KR,US);
H04L9/3252 (EP,CN);
H04L9/0869 (US);
H04L9/3066 (KR,US);
H04L9/3249 (CN);
H04L2209/046 (KR);
H04L2209/08 (KR);
H04L2209/16 (EP);
H04L2209/72 (CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/36] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KRYPTOGRAPHISCHEN SIGNATUR EINER DATENINFORMATION, ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM DAFÜR | [2023/36] | English: | METHOD FOR CRYPTOGRAPHIC SIGNING OF A DATA ITEM, ASSOCIATED ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND COMPUTER PROGRAM | [2023/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SIGNATURE CRYPTOGRAPHIQUE D'UNE DONNÉE, DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR ASSOCIÉS | [2023/36] | Examination procedure | 09.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/36] | 27.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 20.03.2024 | FI | 20.03.2024 | HR | 20.03.2024 | LT | 20.03.2024 | LV | 20.03.2024 | NL | 20.03.2024 | SE | 20.03.2024 | NO | 20.06.2024 | RS | 20.06.2024 | GR | 21.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
LV | 20.03.2024 | ||
SE | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 20.03.2024 | |
NO | 20.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2553866 (IRDETO BV [NL]) [A] 1-15* algorithm 2 *; | [I] - DOTTAX EMMANUELLE ET AL, White-Box ECDSA: Challenges and Existing Solutions, ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, PAGE(S) 184 - 201, (20211021), XP047614346 [I] 1-15 * section 4.1, masking ; algorithm 1 ; section 4.2, Redundancy and Checks of Consistency * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-030-89915-8_9 |