Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007042262 | ![]() | 08.05.2008 | A8 | WO2007042262 | 16.08.2007 | A3 | WO2007042262 | 19.04.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP11648 | 10.10.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8298569 | ![]() | 30.10.2012 | B2 | US2009028955 | 29.01.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US66506605 | 10.10.2005 | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | WO2005EP11649 | 10.10.2005 | US99134604 | 18.11.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008268020 | ![]() | 30.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | WO2005EP11648 | 10.10.2005 | WO2006EP09783 | 10.10.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8273362 | ![]() | 25.09.2012 | B2 | US2008107738 | 08.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | WO2005EP11648 | 10.10.2005 | US66712905 | 10.10.2005 | US99134604 | 18.11.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8372434 | ![]() | 12.02.2013 | B2 | US2007248645 | 25.10.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | WO2005EP11650 | 10.10.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8298568 | ![]() | 30.10.2012 | B2 | US2006100288 | 11.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101333923B | ![]() | 27.11.2013 | B1 | KR20070084107 | 24.08.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | US99134604 | 18.11.2004 | WO2005EP11650 | 10.10.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101319772B | ![]() | 23.10.2013 | B1 | KR20070083573 | 24.08.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | WO2005EP11649 | 10.10.2005 | US99134604 | 18.11.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101286807B | ![]() | 23.07.2013 | B1 | KR20080066675 | 16.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP11648 | 10.10.2005 | WO2006EP09783 | 10.10.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5247453B | ![]() | 24.07.2013 | B2 | JP2009511442 | 19.03.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP11648 | 10.10.2005 | WO2006EP09783 | 10.10.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5122969B | ![]() | 16.01.2013 | B2 | JP2008518993 | 05.06.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | US99134604 | 18.11.2004 | WO2005EP11650 | 10.10.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5008571B | ![]() | 22.08.2012 | B2 | JP2008518992 | 05.06.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | WO2005EP11649 | 10.10.2005 | US99134604 | 18.11.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1937212 | ![]() | 01.09.2010 | B1 | EP1937212 | 02.07.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP06806156 | 10.10.2006 | WO2005EP11648 | 10.10.2005 | WO2006EP09783 | 10.10.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1827373 | ![]() | 03.12.2008 | B1 | EP1827373 | 05.09.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | WO2005EP11648 | 10.10.2005 | EP05800012 | 10.10.2005 | US99134604 | 18.11.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1809238 | ![]() | 29.10.2008 | B1 | EP1809238 | 25.07.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | WO2005EP11649 | 10.10.2005 | US99134604 | 18.11.2004 | EP05802097 | 10.10.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1809237 | ![]() | 31.12.2008 | B1 | EP1809237 | 25.07.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | EP05795930 | 10.10.2005 | US99134604 | 18.11.2004 | WO2005EP11650 | 10.10.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1655021 | ![]() | 29.10.2008 | B1 | EP1655021 | 10.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2006301493B | ![]() | 10.01.2013 | B2 | AU2006301493 | 19.04.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP11648 | 10.10.2005 | WO2006EP09783 | 10.10.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2005304035B | ![]() | 22.07.2010 | B2 | AU2005304035 | 18.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | US99134604 | 18.11.2004 | WO2005EP11650 | 10.10.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2005304034B | ![]() | 16.02.2012 | B2 | AU2005304034 | 18.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | WO2005EP11649 | 10.10.2005 | US99134604 | 18.11.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1929996 | ![]() | 16.02.2011 | B1 | EP1929996 | 20.05.2009 | A3 | EP1929996 | 11.06.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | US99134604 | 18.11.2004 | EP08102553 | 10.10.2005 | EP05802097 | 10.10.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE412400T | 15.11.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE479424T | 15.09.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP11648 | 10.10.2005 | WO2006EP09783 | 10.10.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2578176 | 24.09.2013 | C | CA2578176 | 18.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | WO2005EP11649 | 10.10.2005 | US99134604 | 18.11.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2586074 | 23.07.2013 | C | CA2586074 | 18.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | US99134604 | 18.11.2004 | WO2005EP11650 | 10.10.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2625568 | 08.10.2013 | C | CA2625568 | 19.04.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP11648 | 10.10.2005 | WO2006EP09783 | 10.10.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101014317 | 08.08.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101056615B | 11.05.2011 | B | CN101056615 | 17.10.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | US99134604 | 18.11.2004 | WO2005EP11650 | 10.10.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101282714B | 12.12.2012 | B | CN101282714 | 08.10.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP11648 | 10.10.2005 | WO2006EP09783 | 10.10.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103356481B | 28.11.2017 | B | CN103356481 | 23.10.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | CN200580030069 | 10.10.2005 | US99134604 | 18.11.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602004017477D1 | 11.12.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602005010733D1 | 11.12.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | WO2005EP11649 | 10.10.2005 | US99134604 | 18.11.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602005011480D1 | 15.01.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | WO2005EP11648 | 10.10.2005 | US99134604 | 18.11.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602005012136D1 | 12.02.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | US99134604 | 18.11.2004 | WO2005EP11650 | 10.10.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602006016628D1 | 14.10.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP11648 | 10.10.2005 | WO2006EP09783 | 10.10.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1809237T | 04.05.2009 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | US99134604 | 18.11.2004 | WO2005EP11650 | 10.10.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1809238T | 25.01.2010 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | WO2005EP11649 | 10.10.2005 | US99134604 | 18.11.2004 | EP05802097 | 10.10.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1937212T | 13.12.2010 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP11648 | 10.10.2005 | WO2006EP09783 | 10.10.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2314354T | 16.03.2009 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2351358T | 03.02.2011 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP11648 | 10.10.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1107938 | 25.04.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | US99134604 | 18.11.2004 | WO2005EP11650 | 10.10.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL181446 | 16.06.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | WO2005EP11649 | 10.10.2005 | US99134604 | 18.11.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL182897 | 30.12.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | US99134604 | 18.11.2004 | WO2005EP11650 | 10.10.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL190497 | 31.01.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | WO2005EP11648 | 10.10.2005 | WO2006EP09783 | 10.10.2006 | US99134604 | 18.11.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2007003045 | 02.08.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | WO2005EP11649 | 10.10.2005 | US99134604 | 18.11.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2007005545 | 05.07.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | US99134604 | 18.11.2004 | WO2005EP11650 | 10.10.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ554929 | 30.09.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | US99134604 | 18.11.2004 | WO2005EP11650 | 10.10.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL1937212T | 28.02.2011 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP06806156 | 10.10.2006 | WO2005EP11648 | 10.10.2005 | WO2006EP09783 | 10.10.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1937212E | 30.11.2010 | E | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP11648 | 10.10.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200703751 | 27.08.2008 | B | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006050838 | ![]() | 16.11.2006 | A3 | WO2006050838 | 18.05.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | US99134604 | 18.11.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006050837 | ![]() | 16.11.2006 | A3 | WO2006050837 | 18.05.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | US99134604 | 18.11.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006050836 | ![]() | 12.07.2007 | A3 | WO2006050836 | 18.05.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | US99134604 | 18.11.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5894202B | ![]() | 23.03.2016 | B2 | JP2014088450 | 15.05.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | US99134604 | 18.11.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5587936B | ![]() | 10.09.2014 | B2 | JP2012162549 | 30.08.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | US99134604 | 18.11.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5773941B | ![]() | 02.09.2015 | B2 | JP2012149102 | 09.08.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | US99134604 | 18.11.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE412401T | 15.11.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | US99134604 | 18.11.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE415942T | 15.12.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | US99134604 | 18.11.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE418964T | 15.01.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | US99134604 | 18.11.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE498392T | 15.03.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | US99134604 | 18.11.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602005026464D1 | 31.03.2011 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | US99134604 | 18.11.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2317319T | 16.04.2009 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | US99134604 | 18.11.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2319129T | 04.05.2009 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | US99134604 | 18.11.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2320574T | 25.05.2009 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | US99134604 | 18.11.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1112411 | 05.09.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | US99134604 | 18.11.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1809237E | 09.04.2009 | E | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | US99134604 | 18.11.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1809238E | 09.02.2009 | E | Priority number | Date | EP04292645 | 09.11.2004 | US99134604 | 18.11.2004 | Type | ![]() | EP1809238 |