Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019388217 | Global Dossier | 26.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201461923319 | 03.01.2014 | US201916562486 | 06.09.2019 | US201615109437 | 30.06.2016 | WO2014US73084 | 31.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019388216 | Global Dossier | 26.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201461923319 | 03.01.2014 | US201615109437 | 30.06.2016 | WO2014US73084 | 31.12.2014 | US201916562484 | 06.09.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11771557 | Global Dossier | 03.10.2023 | B2 | US2021275295 | 09.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201461923319 | 03.01.2014 | US202117217189 | 30.03.2021 | US201916562486 | 06.09.2019 | US201615109437 | 30.06.2016 | WO2014US73084 | 31.12.2014 | US201916562484 | 06.09.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10426620 | Global Dossier | 01.10.2019 | B2 | US2016317289 | 03.11.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201415109437 | 31.12.2014 | US201461923319 | 03.01.2014 | WO2014US73084 | 31.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3089706 | Global Dossier | 30.08.2017 | A4 | EP3089706 | 09.11.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201461923319 | 03.01.2014 | WO2014US73084 | 31.12.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015103434 | Global Dossier | 09.07.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201461923319 | 03.01.2014 |